This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2021 at 15:05:54 (UTC).

GEOFFREY PEARSON, ET AL. VS DANIEL GREEN

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 GEOFFREY PEARSON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DANIEL GREEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL J. CONVEY, THERESA M. TRABER and BERNIE C. LAFORTEZA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0846

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL J. CONVEY

THERESA M. TRABER

BERNIE C. LAFORTEZA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PRATT TROY

PEARSON GEOFFREY

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

GREEN DANIEL

KHALILIFARD ALEX

SCHMITT HEATHER

GO JEANNE

LINDGREN GRACE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVI DANIEL

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

SHAHABI KAMRAN M

KALE MICHAEL ALAN

SALDANA MICHAEL GARRETT

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 09/09/2021

9/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 09/09/2021

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/27/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MSC)

2/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MSC)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: MSC) OF 02/25/2021

2/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: MSC) OF 02/25/2021

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

3/2/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFF'S SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF

3/2/2021: Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFF'S SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF

Notice - NOTICE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

3/3/2021: Notice - NOTICE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC) (AVAIL. JUDGE))

3/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC) (AVAIL. JUDGE))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/29/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

1/12/2021: Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

1/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Answer

1/13/2021: Answer

Answer

12/2/2020: Answer

Cross-Complaint

12/2/2020: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

12/4/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • Hearing06/06/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • Hearing05/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • Hearing12/16/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department B at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U, Bernie C. LaForteza, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference) of 09/09/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Daniel Green (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U, Bernie C. LaForteza, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department U, Bernie C. LaForteza, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Order Extending Time to Serve and Order Continuing Case Management Conference); Filed by Geoffrey Pearson (Plaintiff); Troy Pratt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application f...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Geoffrey Pearson (Plaintiff); Troy Pratt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Geoffrey Pearson (Plaintiff); Troy Pratt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Geoffrey Pearson (Plaintiff); Troy Pratt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Geoffrey Pearson (Plaintiff); Troy Pratt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Geoffrey Pearson (Plaintiff); Troy Pratt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Geoffrey Pearson (Plaintiff); Troy Pratt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAHABI KAMRAN M