This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2020 at 16:18:50 (UTC).

GENO CHEUN VS LOGAN SYNDER

Case Summary

On 01/23/2019 GENO CHEUN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOGAN SYNDER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2283

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHEUN GENO

Claimant

STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND

Defendants

SYNDER LOGAN

SNYDER LOGAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETROUSIAN ARTHUR

Claimant Attorneys

ROCHA VICTOR

BROWN CHARLES HENRY II

Defendant Attorney

OBERRECHT KIMBERLY S.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/8/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/15/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Lien

2/10/2020: Notice of Lien

Notice - NOTICE LIEN CLAIMANT'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

2/10/2020: Notice - NOTICE LIEN CLAIMANT'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/17/2020

6/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/17/2020

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/10/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

8/21/2019: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

8/22/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Lien

8/29/2019: Notice of Lien

Proof of Personal Service

7/25/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/3/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

2/15/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

Other - - Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

2/15/2019: Other - - Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/23/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/23/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/23/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/23/2019: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Logan Snyder Erroneously Sued As Logan Snyder (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • Docketat 11:27 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/17/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketAmended Notice of Lien; Filed by State Compensation Insurance Fund (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketNotice (LIEN CLAIMANT'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY); Filed by State Compensation Insurance Fund (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Logan Snyder Erroneously Sued As Logan Snyder (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Geno Cheun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by State Compensation Insurance Fund (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Geno Cheun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Logan Snyder Erroneously Sued As Logan Snyder (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Geno Cheun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Geno Cheun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketStanding Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Geno Cheun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Geno Cheun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Geno Cheun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROCHA, VICTOR

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN CHARLES H. II ESQ