Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 11:20:12 (UTC).

GENISA IRON, INC VS S.E. WELCO , INC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/20/2017 GENISA IRON, INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against S E WELCO , INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN C. YEP. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7480

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN C. YEP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

GENISA IRON INC. A DOMESTIC CORP DBA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SKYLINE STREEL INC. A FOREIGN CORP DBA

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH

OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY

TOSHIBA INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

NRG ENERGY INC.

S.E. WELCO INC.

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SKYLINE STREEL INC. A FOREIGN CORP DBA

GENISA IRON INC. A DOMESTIC CORP DBA

Defendants and Cross Defendants

OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY

GENISA IRON INC. A DOMESTIC CORP DBA

S.E. WELCO INC.

COUSER SHANNON E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PACIULLI CARLO

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BUSCEMI MICHAEL RICHARD

KENNEDY KEVIN PETER

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

KENNEDY KEVIN PETER

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

6/5/2019: Minute Order

SUMMONS

10/20/2017: SUMMONS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

2/6/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

3/16/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

4/3/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/17/2018: DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/22/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

5/22/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Notice of Motion

8/27/2018: Notice of Motion

Unknown

9/28/2018: Unknown

Answer

12/3/2018: Answer

Declaration

12/3/2018: Declaration

Notice

12/21/2018: Notice

Notice of Settlement

5/1/2019: Notice of Settlement

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT, ENFORCEMENT OF MECHANIC'S LIEN RELEASE BOND, ACCOUNTS STATES, OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT, REASONABLE VALUE OF MATERIALS FURNISHED

1/12/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT, ENFORCEMENT OF MECHANIC'S LIEN RELEASE BOND, ACCOUNTS STATES, OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT, REASONABLE VALUE OF MATERIALS FURNISHED

SUMMONS

1/12/2018: SUMMONS

Proof of Service

12/12/2017: Proof of Service

PLAINTIFF'S FILING OF RECORDED NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

11/22/2017: PLAINTIFF'S FILING OF RECORDED NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Skyline Streel, Inc. A Foreigh Corp DBA (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Skyline Streel, Inc. A Foreigh Corp DBA (Cross-Complainant); Western Surety Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Notice of Settlement (of Plaintiff Genisa Iron, Inc and Defendant Skyline Steel, Inc.); Filed by Genisa Iron, Inc. A Domestic Corp DBA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Notice (of Stay of Proceedings); Filed by Skyline Streel, Inc. A Foreigh Corp DBA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Answer (-Amended- to cross complaint); Filed by Genisa Iron, Inc. A Domestic Corp DBA (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
114 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2010
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NRG Energy, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TOSHIBA INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SKYLINE STEEL INC is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant