This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/10/2022 at 01:14:32 (UTC).

GENESIS GONZALEZ ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES, ALL AGGRIEVED EMPLOYEES, AND STATE OF CA AS PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL,, ET AL. VS MRS. GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 GENESIS GONZALEZ ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES, ALL AGGRIEVED EMPLOYEES, AND STATE OF CA AS PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MRS GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAREN NELSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0610

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAREN NELSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GENESIS GONZALEZ ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES ALL AGGRIEVED EMPLOYEES AND STATE OF CA AS PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL

GERRY SIEMON ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES ALL AGGRIEVED EMPLOYEES AND STATE OF CA AS PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL

Defendants

MRS. GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WHOLE FOODS MARKET CALIFORNIA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MRS. GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOULLOUKIAN NAZO

Defendant Attorney

MICHALAK IAN A.

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NAZO KOULLOUKIAN IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON APRIL 14, 2022

4/20/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NAZO KOULLOUKIAN IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON APRIL 14, 2022

Notice of Ruling

4/19/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/21/2022

3/21/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/21/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Case Management Statement

3/30/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/4/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

3/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 03/18/2022

3/18/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 03/18/2022

Answer

3/7/2022: Answer

Notice of Related Case

3/10/2022: Notice of Related Case

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/1/2022: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

1/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/14/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

1/6/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/6/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • Hearing06/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Against Plaintiff's Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • Hearing06/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (OF NAZO KOULLOUKIAN IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON APRIL 14, 2022); Filed by GENESIS GONZALEZ on behalf of themselves, all aggrieved employees, and State of CA as Private Attorneys General, (Plaintiff); GERRY SIEMON, on behalf of themselves, all aggrieved employees, and State of CA as Private Attorneys General, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by MRS. GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by GENESIS GONZALEZ on behalf of themselves, all aggrieved employees, and State of CA as Private Attorneys General, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by MRS. GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • Docketat 07:25 AM in Department 40; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/21/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by GENESIS GONZALEZ on behalf of themselves, all aggrieved employees, and State of CA as Private Attorneys General, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by GENESIS GONZALEZ on behalf of themselves, all aggrieved employees, and State of CA as Private Attorneys General, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by GENESIS GONZALEZ on behalf of themselves, all aggrieved employees, and State of CA as Private Attorneys General, (Plaintiff); GERRY SIEMON, on behalf of themselves, all aggrieved employees, and State of CA as Private Attorneys General, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by GENESIS GONZALEZ on behalf of themselves, all aggrieved employees, and State of CA as Private Attorneys General, (Plaintiff); GERRY SIEMON, on behalf of themselves, all aggrieved employees, and State of CA as Private Attorneys General, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by GENESIS GONZALEZ on behalf of themselves, all aggrieved employees, and State of CA as Private Attorneys General, (Plaintiff); GERRY SIEMON, on behalf of themselves, all aggrieved employees, and State of CA as Private Attorneys General, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHOLE FOODS MARKET CALIFORNIA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where MRS. GOOCH'S NATURAL FOOD MARKETS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHALAK IAN A.