This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/25/2019 at 08:02:30 (UTC).

GENERAL ENTERTAINMENT & MUSIC LLC VS SAEED NOOSHINFAR

Case Summary

On 03/13/2018 GENERAL ENTERTAINMENT MUSIC LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SAEED NOOSHINFAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YOLANDA OROZCO, LAURA A. SEIGLE and AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7828

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

YOLANDA OROZCO

LAURA A. SEIGLE

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GENERAL ENTERTAINMENT & MUSIC LLC

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 10

NOOSHINFAR SAEED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

RAINES FELDMAN LLP

SMALL LEON

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

PARVANEH ALI ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

12/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/12/2019

12/12/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/12/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Motion to Consolidate

10/24/2019: Motion to Consolidate

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING

10/7/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

10/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER REQUESTING THAT ...)

9/17/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER REQUESTING THAT ...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF FAILURE TO OPPOSE

7/29/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF FAILURE TO OPPOSE

Motion re: - MOTION RE: MOTION TO CONTEST NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

6/26/2019: Motion re: - MOTION RE: MOTION TO CONTEST NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 06/05/2019

6/5/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 06/05/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

6/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

Notice of Settlement

5/16/2019: Notice of Settlement

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER

3/26/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER

Notice - Notice of Continuance of Case Management Conference

1/24/2019: Notice - Notice of Continuance of Case Management Conference

Declaration - Amended Declaration of Paige Counsman

1/25/2019: Declaration - Amended Declaration of Paige Counsman

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

9/24/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

10/24/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

SUMMONS -

3/13/2018: SUMMONS -

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2019
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Consolidate - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate; Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/12/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continued Hearing); Filed by Saeed Nooshinfar (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketNotice (Of General Entertainment & Music, LLC's Failute to Oppose Saeed Nooshinfar's Motion to Consolidate); Filed by Saeed Nooshinfar (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketReply (Brief: Notice that Moving Party Received No Opposition to the Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel); Filed by General Entertainment & Music LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Saeed Nooshinfar (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT SAEED NOOSHINFARS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by General Entertainment & Music LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by General Entertainment & Music LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC697828    Hearing Date: December 12, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

On January 5, 2018, Saeed Nooshinfar (“Nooshinfar”) filed a small claims case against General Entertainment & Music, LLC (“GEM”). On March 13, 2018, GEM filed a civil action against Nooshinfar and an application for transfer of the small claims case to the department with the civil case. These two cases were deemed related on October 10, 2019. The Nooshinfar now move to consolidate the cases.

Code of Civil Procedure section 116.390, subdivision (a) provides: “If a defendant has a claim against a plaintiff that exceeds the jurisdictional limits stated in Sections 116.220, 116.221, and 116.231, and the claim relates to the contract, transaction, matter, or event which is the subject of the plaintiff's claim, the defendant may commence an action against the plaintiff in a court of competent jurisdiction and request the small claims court to transfer the small claims action to that court.” In Acuna v. Gunderson Chevrolet, Inc. (1993) 19 Cal.App.4th 1467 the court concluded the trial court lacked jurisdiction to consolidate a small claims case with a pending civil case and cited section 116.390 as providing “the only circumstances under which a small claims case may be transferred to another court.” (Id. at p. 1472.)

Accordingly, the motion to consolidate is DENIED. In addition, the matters should not have been related. Therefore, the cases are deemed not related.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court