This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2020 at 06:59:01 (UTC).

GENERAL ANESTHESIA SPECIALISTS PARTNERSHIP MEDICAL GROUP, A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP, VS YARON HAZANI, MD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 GENERAL ANESTHESIA SPECIALISTS PARTNERSHIP MEDICAL GROUP, A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against YARON HAZANI, MD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4090

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GENERAL ANESTHESIA SPECIALISTS PARTNERSHIP MEDICAL GROUP A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP

GENERAL ANESTHESIA SPECIALISTS PARTNERSHIP MEDICAL GROUP

Defendants

HAZANI MD YARON

HAZANI MEDICAL CORPORATION APC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SMITH GREG

SMITH GREGORY M. ESQ.

MUELLER CARL I.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/6/2019: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/6/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/6/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/6/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/6/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

1/15/2020: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

1/8/2020: Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUA...)

12/17/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUA...)

Notice of Ruling

12/17/2019: Notice of Ruling

Judgment - JUDGMENT - STIPULATED JUDGMENT - BEFORE TRIAL - 12/17/2019 ENTERED FOR PLAINTIFF GENERAL ANESTHESIA SPECIALISTS PARTNERSHIP MEDICAL GROUP, A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP AGAINST DEFENDANT

12/17/2019: Judgment - JUDGMENT - STIPULATED JUDGMENT - BEFORE TRIAL - 12/17/2019 ENTERED FOR PLAINTIFF GENERAL ANESTHESIA SPECIALISTS PARTNERSHIP MEDICAL GROUP, A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP AGAINST DEFENDANT

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

12/17/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION BY THE PARTIES

12/16/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION BY THE PARTIES

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by General Anesthesia Specialists Partnership Medical Group (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale; Filed by General Anesthesia Specialists Partnership Medical Group (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; Hearing on Ex Parte Application ( for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to Stipulation by the Parties) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketJudgment (- Stipulated Judgment - Before Trial - 12/17/2019 entered for Plaintiff General Anesthesia Specialists Partnership Medical Group, a California General partnership against Defendant Yaron Hazani, MD; Defendant Hazani Medical Corporation, APC.); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Entry of Judgment Pursua...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment); Filed by General Anesthesia Specialists Partnership Medical Group (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by General Anesthesia Specialists Partnership Medical Group (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (For Entry of Judgment Pursuant to Stipulation by the Parties); Filed by General Anesthesia Specialists Partnership Medical Group (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by General Anesthesia Specialists Partnership Medical Group (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by General Anesthesia Specialists Partnership Medical Group (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by General Anesthesia Specialists Partnership Medical Group (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by General Anesthesia Specialists Partnership Medical Group (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GENERAL ANESTHESIA SPECIALISTS PARTNERSHIP MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH GREGORY M. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MUELLER CARL I.S.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH GREG