This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2021 at 12:49:52 (UTC).

GEMCAP LENDING I, LLC VS DONALD E ALBER

Case Summary

On 03/04/2020 GEMCAP LENDING I, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DONALD E ALBER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON and ARMEN TAMZARIAN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8974

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

ARMEN TAMZARIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEMCAP LENDING I LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

ALBER DONALD E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LANDER TODD

ADAMS WILLIAM E.

Defendant Attorneys

ROSE STEPHEN

TAYLOR DANIEL J

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/3/2021: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 05/03/2021

5/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 05/03/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

5/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Settlement

5/3/2021: Notice of Settlement

Case Management Statement

1/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF MINUTE ORDER DATED JANUARY 19, 2021

1/25/2021: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF MINUTE ORDER DATED JANUARY 19, 2021

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/3/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

2/10/2021: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED) ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

2/16/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED) ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Substitution of Attorney

7/29/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Case Management Order

6/23/2020: Case Management Order

Answer

4/21/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

4/2/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/9/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/4/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/4/2020: Complaint

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • Hearing07/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by GemCap Lending I, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • Docketat 10:22 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by GemCap Lending I, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Notice of Settlement) of 05/03/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Jury Trial ((5 days)) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (JOINT TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES); Filed by Donald E Alber (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by GemCap Lending I, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Donald E Alber (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Donald E Alber (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by GemCap Lending I, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by GemCap Lending I, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by GemCap Lending I, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by GemCap Lending I, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GemCap Lending I, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Taylor, Daniel J