This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2021 at 01:33:05 (UTC).

GEMCAP LENDING I, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS ACTIVE HOLDINGS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/24/2020 GEMCAP LENDING I, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ACTIVE HOLDINGS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1818

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

GEMCAP LENDING I LLC

ELLIS DAVID

MIDCAP FUNDING TRUST XVIII

GEMELLI GROUP LLC

MIDCAP FUNDING XVII TRUST ESA MIDCAP FUNDING TRUST XVII

ELLIS RICHARD

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BERNSTEIN JOHN

ACTIVE HOLDINGS LLC

LITTLE CAROL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADAMS WILLIAM E.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

THOMAS WENDY MAY

THOMAS WENDY M.

Cross Defendant Attorneys

LANDER TODD M.

BEEHLER ANNE REDCROSS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by GemCap Lending I, LLC (Plaintiff); Midcap Funding Trust XVIII (Plaintiff); Active Holdings, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (- NOT ENTERED); Filed by Midcap Funding Trust XVIII (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Docketat 09:15 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Leave (by Pltf MidCap Funding XVII Trust For Order Substituting Gemelli Group, LLC as Real Party In Interest in place of Plaintiff MidCap Funding Trust XVII Pursuant to C.C.P. 368.5 [007574267183]*-) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Docketat 09:15 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (by XDeft MidCap Funding Trust XVIII to First Amended Cross-complaint of Active Holdings, LLC [397628457217]*-) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Docketat 09:15 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (For Defendants Jon Bernstein, Carol Little and Active Holdings, LLC); Filed by Active Holdings, LLC (Defendant); Jon Bernstein Erroneously Sued As John Bernstein (Defendant); Carol Little (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketAnswer (- Defendants Active Holdings, LLC's, Jon Bernstein's, and Carol Little's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint); Filed by Active Holdings, LLC (Defendant); Jon Bernstein Erroneously Sued As John Bernstein (Defendant); Carol Little (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by GemCap Lending I, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by GemCap Lending I, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by GemCap Lending I, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by GemCap Lending I, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by GemCap Lending I, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by GemCap Lending I, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Active Holdings LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GemCap Lending I, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEEHLER ANNE REDCROSS