This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2019 at 00:10:25 (UTC).

GELLY Y VALERO VS SARAH F KARSH TRUST ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/26/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by GELLY Y VALERO against SARAH F KARSH TRUST in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1857

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

VALERO GELLY Y.

Defendants and Respondents

KARSH FAMILY TRUST

DOES 1 THROUGH 30

SARAH F. KARSH TRUST

KARSH DOE 1 SHARONE F.

SHARON F. KARSH TRUST

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

6/18/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

NOTICE OF REJECTION DEFAULT/CLERK'S JUDGMENT

6/18/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION DEFAULT/CLERK'S JUDGMENT

ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: ETC

6/21/2018: ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: ETC

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

8/10/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/23/2018: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Substitution of Attorney

11/14/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

1/10/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Answer

2/19/2019: Answer

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

3/15/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/4/2018: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/27/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/27/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

2/20/2018: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

2/20/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

SUMMONS

2/20/2018: SUMMONS

SUMMONS

1/26/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. PREMESES LIABELITY 2. NEGLLGENCE

1/26/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. PREMESES LIABELITY 2. NEGLLGENCE

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Gelly Y. Valero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Answer (to First Amended Complaint); Filed by Sharone F. Karsh (Doe 1) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Sarah F. Karsh Trust (Defendant); Sharone F. Karsh (Doe 1) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Terry Timothy McAuliffe, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Gelly Y. Valero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious Name) Doe 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Karsh, Sharone F. (Doe 1) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Answer to First Amended Complaint; Filed by Sarah F. Karsh Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Gelly Y. Valero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Gelly Y. Valero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Gelly Y. Valero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Gelly Y. Valero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Gelly Y. Valero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. PREMESES LIABELITY 2. NEGLLGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC691857    Hearing Date: February 14, 2020    Dept: 27

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY

This motion is moot, as the Court already reopened discovery.

The request for sanctions is DENIED. Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 2023.040, “[A] request for sanctions shall, in then notice of motion, identify every person, party, and attorney against whom the sanction is sought, and specify the type of sanction sought.” Plaintiff’s notice of motion does not state that Plaintiff is seeking sanctions.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.