This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 02:56:25 (UTC).

GELB ENTERPRISES VS. ADEL MIKHAIL FRANSIS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/22/2017 GELB ENTERPRISES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ADEL MIKHAIL FRANSIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. CONVEY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5327

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL J. CONVEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GELB ENTERPRISES

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1-10

FRANSIS ADEL MECHAIL

FRANSIS ADEL MIKHAIL

FRANSIS EMAD MIKHAIL

FRANSIS ADEL MIKHAIL AKA ADEL MECHAIL FRANSIS

Cross Defendants

LEWIS MARI-ANN DOE 1

MARI-ANN LEWIS TRUST DOE 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BAYER KENNETH HOWARD

GENTINO ROBERT E.

LAHIRI RANJAN ALOK

Defendant Attorney

EKPENISI MACAULEY ISIOMA

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/22/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown

4/14/2017: Unknown

Case Management Statement

6/28/2017: Case Management Statement

Unknown

6/29/2017: Unknown

Unknown

7/19/2017: Unknown

Unknown

7/24/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/4/2017: Unknown

Case Management Statement

8/28/2017: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/6/2017: Case Management Statement

Unknown

9/13/2017: Unknown

Notice of Ruling

12/15/2017: Notice of Ruling

Unknown

12/15/2017: Unknown

Unknown

2/8/2018: Unknown

Unknown

3/2/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

3/2/2018: Minute Order

Order

9/28/2018: Order

Request for Dismissal

11/5/2018: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order

12/10/2018: Minute Order

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department U, Michael J. Convey, Presiding; (OSC-Failure to File Dism or Judg) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : OSC-Failure to File Dism or Judg)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Order (of Dismissal with the Court Retaining Jurisdiction per CCP 664.6); Filed by Gelb Enterprises (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Gelb Enterprises (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • at 08:32 AM in Department U, Michael J. Convey, Presiding; (OSC-Failure to File Dism or Judg) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Order to Show Cause re: Failure to File Dismissal)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause re: Failure to File Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Emad Mikhail Fransis (Cross-Complainant); Adel Mikhail Fransis (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Order

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2017
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by Adel Mikhail Fransis (Defendant); Emad Mikhail Fransis (Defendant); Adel Mechail Fransis (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Adel Mikhail Fransis (Defendant); Emad Mikhail Fransis (Defendant); Adel Mechail Fransis (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Adel Mikhail Fransis (Defendant); Emad Mikhail Fransis (Defendant); Adel Mechail Fransis (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Notice-Association of Counsel; Filed by Gelb Enterprises (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Gelb Enterprises (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Gelb Enterprises (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Gelb Enterprises (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Gelb Enterprises (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gelb Enterprises (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GELB Enterprises is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EKPENISI MACAULEY ISIOMA