This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/27/2021 at 08:45:28 (UTC).

GEE, GERRY WIN - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 GEE, GERRY WIN - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8814

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GEE SUZIE MAY

Decedent

GEE GERRY WIN

Not Classified By Court

MORRIS MICHAEL SCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CHIU KEVIN KIN

 

Court Documents

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

9/13/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Will in Safekeeping - 5 pgs - Dated - 08/12/2015 - 21STSK00736

4/2/2021: Will in Safekeeping - 5 pgs - Dated - 08/12/2015 - 21STSK00736

Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

9/9/2021: Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • Hearing11/04/2021 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 11 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Will (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketWill in Safekeeping (5 pgs - Dated - 08/12/2015 - 21STSK00736 ); Filed by Depositor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHIU KEVIN KIN