This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 16:31:15 (UTC).

GAYLE MAKASIAN VS CITY OF SANTA MONICA, A PUBLIC ENTITY

Case Summary

On 10/14/2022 GAYLE MAKASIAN filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CITY OF SANTA MONICA, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is H. JAY FORD III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1921

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

H. JAY FORD III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAKASIAN GAYLE

Defendant

CITY OF SANTA MONICA A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHEN ROBERT

Defendant Attorney

CHUNG ALICE

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/14/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/20/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Motion for Trial Preference

11/4/2022: Motion for Trial Preference

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/4/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

11/17/2022: Answer

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

11/17/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE)

12/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2023
  • Hearing02/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Opposition to Motion for Trial Preference; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration: Name Extension: blank ; Exact Name: Opposition to Motion for Trial Preference; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Answer to Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial: Exact Name: Answer to Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion for Trial Preference: Filed By: GAYLE MAKASIAN (Plaintiff); Result: Denied ; Result Date: 12/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion for Trial Preference: Exact Name: blank ; As To Parties changed from CITY OF SANTA MONICA, a Public Entity (Defendant) to CITY OF SANTA MONICA, a Public Entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion for Trial Preference; Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Declaration of Robert Cohen, ESQ in Support Thereof: Exact Name: Motion for Trial Preference; Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Declaration of Robert Cohen, ESQ in Support Thereof ; Result Date changed from 12/06/2022 to 12/06/2022 ; As To Parties changed from CITY OF SANTA MONICA, a Public Entity (Defendant) to CITY OF SANTA MONICA, a Public Entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Trial Preference scheduled for 12/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department O updated: Result Date to 12/06/2022; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketPursuant to oral stipulation, Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department O Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 02/01/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Trial Preference scheduled for 12/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketMotion for Trial Preference; Filed by: GAYLE MAKASIAN (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF SANTA MONICA, a Public Entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. H. Jay Ford III in Department O Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: GAYLE MAKASIAN (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF SANTA MONICA, a Public Entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: GAYLE MAKASIAN (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF SANTA MONICA, a Public Entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: GAYLE MAKASIAN (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF SANTA MONICA, a Public Entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: GAYLE MAKASIAN (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF SANTA MONICA, a Public Entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF SANTA MONICA is a litigant