This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2022 at 17:52:33 (UTC).

GAYANE POGOSYAN VS CITY OF GLENDALE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 GAYANE POGOSYAN filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CITY OF GLENDALE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0492

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POGOSYAN GAYANE

Defendants

BABAI LIDA

CITY OF GLENDALE

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOOKER ROBERT L

Defendant Attorneys

KANG EDWARD B.

STOCKALPER PATRICK EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/19/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/19/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

9/19/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

9/19/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/19/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/19/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

9/26/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/3/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

10/18/2022: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

10/18/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

10/19/2022: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/23/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2024
  • Hearing09/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2024
  • Hearing03/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2024
  • Hearing03/04/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Signed and Filed by: GAYANE POGOSYAN (Plaintiff); As to: Kong Tae H and Sangsun TRS: Kong Family Trust Erroneously Sued As LIDA BABAI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name): Filed By: GAYANE POGOSYAN (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 12/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: CITY OF GLENDALE (Defendant); As to: GAYANE POGOSYAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); As to: GAYANE POGOSYAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: GAYANE POGOSYAN (Plaintiff); As to: LIDA BABAI (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/03/2022; Service Cost: 158.39; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: GAYANE POGOSYAN (Plaintiff); As to: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); Service Date: 09/26/2022; Service Cost: 124.51; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: GAYANE POGOSYAN (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF GLENDALE (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); LIDA BABAI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: GAYANE POGOSYAN (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF GLENDALE (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant); LIDA BABAI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/04/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF GLENDALE A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOOKER II ROBERT L. ESQ.