This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/19/2021 at 20:39:03 (UTC).

GAYANE DIANA TER-SAAKYAN VS ANIL MEHTA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 GAYANE DIANA TER-SAAKYAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ANIL MEHTA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7784

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TER-SAAKYAN GAYANE DIANA

Defendants

J.K. PROPERTIES INC.

J.K. RESIDENTIAL SERVICES INC.

JOGANI HARESH

MEHTA ANIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIGOGHOSIAN SEVAG

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/13/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/5/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/5/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/5/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/5/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

11/4/2021: PI General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2024
  • Hearing10/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • Hearing04/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • Hearing03/29/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Gayane Diana Ter-Saakyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Gayane Diana Ter-Saakyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Gayane Diana Ter-Saakyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Gayane Diana Ter-Saakyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gayane Diana Ter-Saakyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gayane Diana Ter-Saakyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gayane Diana Ter-Saakyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J.K. PROPERTIES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where J.K. RESIDENTIAL SERVICES INC. is a litigant