This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2019 at 01:01:35 (UTC).

GAUSMAN VAN NUYS INC VS BAT EL AVITAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/15/2018 GAUSMAN VAN NUYS INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BAT EL AVITAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BARBARA A. MEIERS and WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2769

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BARBARA A. MEIERS

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

GAUSMAN VAN NUYS INC. A CALIFORNIA

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

GREEN SHY HOME REMODELING INC. A

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

AVITAN BAT EL

GREEN SKY HOME REMODELING INC. A

AVITAN SHLOMI

Cross Defendants and Defendants

GEDALIA EASHAK

GREEN SKY HOME REMODELING INC. A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

RAY B. BOWEN JR.

BOWEN RAY B. JR

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ILEANE KURTZMAN ESQ

RAYMOND M. SUTTON. ESQ.

SUTTON RAYMOND M.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

KURTZMAN ILENE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/25/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

7/24/2018: Minute Order

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

10/3/2018: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL

Request for Dismissal

2/14/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

2/22/2019: Notice of Ruling

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

4/26/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Minute Order

4/20/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING REGARDING PROOF OF SERVICE

4/20/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING REGARDING PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/15/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT GREEN SKY HOME REMODELING, INC.

3/15/2018: ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT GREEN SKY HOME REMODELING, INC.

DEFENDANT BAT-EL AVITAN'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/15/2018: DEFENDANT BAT-EL AVITAN'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS BAT-EL AVITAN AND SHLOMI ABITTAN TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/15/2018: ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS BAT-EL AVITAN AND SHLOMI ABITTAN TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

SUPPLEMENT TO REPLY TO MOTION TO RECLASSIFY; ETC.

3/15/2018: SUPPLEMENT TO REPLY TO MOTION TO RECLASSIFY; ETC.

NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

3/15/2018: NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

3/15/2018: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

3/15/2018: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

Minute Order

3/15/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/15/2018: Minute Order

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 56; Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • at 08:32 AM in Department 56; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Green Sky Home Remodeling, Inc., a (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Gausman Van Nuys, Inc., a California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 56; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (TO GREEN SKY HOME REMODELING, INC.) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
123 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2018
  • Certificate Of Mailing - Attachment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Stipulation; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Answer to First Amended Complaint; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Answer to First Amended Complaint; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREEN SKY HOME REMODELING INC is a litigant