Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2021 at 16:01:50 (UTC).

GASTON, MAHLON VS JOHNSON, HAROLD

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 GASTON, MAHLON filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against JOHNSON, HAROLD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SPEAR, EMILY T. and KIM, ESTHER P.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0023

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SPEAR, EMILY T.

KIM, ESTHER P.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GASTON MAHLON

Respondent

JOHNSON HAROLD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

RODRIGUEZ PATRICIA RENEE

 

Court Documents

Statement - of Facts

4/19/2021: Statement - of Facts

RFO/MTN - DV (No Fee)

4/19/2021: RFO/MTN - DV (No Fee)

RFO/MTN - DV (No Fee)

4/19/2021: RFO/MTN - DV (No Fee)

RFO/MTN - DV (No Fee)

4/19/2021: RFO/MTN - DV (No Fee)

RFO/MTN - DV (No Fee)

4/19/2021: RFO/MTN - DV (No Fee)

FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

4/23/2021: FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

Proof of Service - Mail

5/3/2021: Proof of Service - Mail

FCS-Mediation Memo

5/5/2021: FCS-Mediation Memo

Minute Order

5/19/2021: Minute Order

Proof of Service

5/26/2021: Proof of Service

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

2/2/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

2/25/2021: Minute Order

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

3/18/2021: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Granted

1/12/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Granted

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/12/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

1/12/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

1/12/2021: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Granted

1/12/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Granted

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department N, Spear, Emily T., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130) (1st AMENDED DV-130 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketResponsive Declaration; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketWitness List; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketStatement - of Facts; Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketRFO/MTN - DV (No Fee); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department N, Spear, Emily T., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Not Held - Continued by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (Granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (Granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RODRIGUEZ PATRICIA RENEE