This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2021 at 23:16:42 (UTC).

GARY WILLIAMS VS JULIE SINGLETARY

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 GARY WILLIAMS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JULIE SINGLETARY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2812

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS GARY

Defendant

SINGLETARY JULIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PELAEZ GRACE JACQUELINE

Defendant Attorney

BLOCK RYAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/18/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

6/25/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

6/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Answer

8/5/2021: Answer

Answer

8/5/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

7/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2024
  • Hearing06/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • Hearing12/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • Hearing12/02/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Julie Singletary (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Julie Singletary (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Gary Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gary Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gary Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gary Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PELAEZ GRACE JACQUELINE