This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 03:08:48 (UTC).

GARY SCHULTZ, ET AL. VS SHAWN YASHAR, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/13/2019 GARY SCHULTZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SHAWN YASHAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2158

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SCHULTZ MARIA

SCHULTZ GARY

Cross Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Defendants

PRECISION BUILDING & DEVELOPMENT INC.

YASHAR SHAWN

CENTURY CONSTRUCTION BUILDERS INC.

LEON KOUS DRILLING INC.

LEON KROUS DRILLING INC.

KHAJAVI SIAVOSH

LEON CROSS DRILLING

LEON KRAUS DRILLING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KARLIN ANDREW T.

KARLIN ANDREW TODD

Cross Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

STEPHENSON ALEXA PAIGE

LEWIN RODNEY THEODORE

BARTLETT CHANDLER OWEN

GORDON GREGORY HOWARD

REIMERS ETHAN A.

CHAZEN ALEX MICHAEL

MONROE SCOTT WILLIAM

TAYLOR KENNETH ORVILLE

CHAZEN ALEX

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

8/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

8/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/25/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Answer

4/12/2021: Answer

Substitution of Attorney

4/14/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER TO SHAWN YASHAR'S CROSS-COMPLAINT (ORDER SEPARATE)

2/22/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER TO SHAWN YASHAR'S CROSS-COMPLAINT (ORDER SEPARATE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFSS' COMPLAINT

3/1/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFSS' COMPLAINT

Answer

3/19/2021: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANS TO LEON KROUS DRILLING, INC.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

2/9/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANS TO LEON KROUS DRILLING, INC.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice of Ruling

1/11/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

12/29/2020: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

12/29/2020: Case Management Statement

Answer

12/18/2020: Answer

Case Management Statement

12/22/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/22/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

12/23/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/23/2020: Case Management Statement

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • Hearing09/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketOrder (Notice of Assignment of Cases for All Purposes); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Scott William Monroe (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Continuance of Trial Setting Conference); Filed by Gary Schultz (Plaintiff); Maria Schultz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Leon Krous Drilling, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Leon Krous Drilling, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Century Construction Builders, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation for Leave to File Amended Answer to Plaintiffss' Complaint); Filed by Precision Building & Development, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/18/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Siavosh Khajavi (Cross-Complainant); Precision Building & Development, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Precision Building & Development, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Precision Building & Development, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gary Schultz (Plaintiff); Maria Schultz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gary Schultz (Plaintiff); Maria Schultz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gary Schultz (Plaintiff); Maria Schultz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRECISION BUILDING & DEVELOPMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LEON KROUS DRILLING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KARLIN ANDREW T. ESQ.