This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/07/2021 at 02:31:03 (UTC).

GARY NOBIENSKY VS CEDARS-SINAI HEALTH SYSTEM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 GARY NOBIENSKY filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CEDARS-SINAI HEALTH SYSTEM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3079

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NOBIENSKY GARY

Defendants

CEDARS-SINAI HEALTH SYSTEM

CHICAS ALFONSO

NICKS SHAB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEGERIAN CARNEY RICHARD

Defendant Attorney

RODRIGUEZ LISA

 

Court Documents

Answer

7/26/2021: Answer

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/28/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/28/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/14/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/21/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/21/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/21/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • Hearing12/13/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Cedars-Sinai Medical Center Erroneously Sued As Cedars-Sinai Health System (Defendant); Shab Nicks (Defendant); Alfonso Chicas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Gary Nobiensky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Gary Nobiensky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Gary Nobiensky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gary Nobiensky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gary Nobiensky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gary Nobiensky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CEDARS-SINAI HEALTH SYSTEMS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shegerian, Carney R