This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2022 at 11:32:00 (UTC).

GARY NEZRI VS PAYPAL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/10/2022 GARY NEZRI filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against PAYPAL, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THERESA M. TRABER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5187

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THERESA M. TRABER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEZRI GARY

Defendant

PAYPAL INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RAMJI RIZWAN RAMZANALI

RAMJI RIZWAN R.

Defendant Attorney

SIDKOFF JUDITH S.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/10/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

2/10/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/10/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/10/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

3/3/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/14/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

3/30/2022: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER:)

5/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER:)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER:) OF 05/17/2022

5/17/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER:) OF 05/17/2022

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COURTS MAY 17, 2022 MINUTE ORDER

5/18/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COURTS MAY 17, 2022 MINUTE ORDER

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2022
  • Hearing10/12/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF COURTS MAY 17, 2022 MINUTE ORDER); Filed by Gary Nezri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • Docketat 12:32 PM in Department 47, Theresa M. Traber, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER:) of 05/17/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (COURT ORDER:)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Paypal, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Gary Nezri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gary Nezri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gary Nezri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gary Nezri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PayPal is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIDKOFF JUDITH SHOPHET