This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/15/2020 at 10:47:40 (UTC).

GARY LEHTO, ET AL. VS THE AES CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2019 GARY LEHTO filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against THE AES CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAREN NELSON and YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4396

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAREN NELSON

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEHTO GARY

HENDERSON JAMESSA

HUTCHISON WILLIAM

VALLE OFELIA

VON TEMPSKY CYNTHIA

TAYLOR JACK

FAWLEY BRAD

DE LA TORRE JUAN

SAMS EAGLE

SANCHEZ GILBERTO

OSENI KOLAWOLE

BAKER RANDLE

HOWARD ANN

Defendants

THE AES CORPORATION

AES SOUTHLAND ENERGY LLC

WINTERS STEVEN

AES SOUTHLAND ENERGY HOLDINGS II LLC

AES REDONDO BEACH LLC

PENDERGRAFT ERIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRUJILLO ANTHONY WILLIAM

Attorney at TRUJILLO & WINNICK, LLP

2919 1/2 Main St

Santa Monica, CA 90405

Defendant Attorney

MADDIGAN MICHAEL MCDONALD

Other Attorneys

ADAMS JENNIFER P.

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER REGARDING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JENNIFER P. ADAMS

11/5/2020: Order - ORDER REGARDING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JENNIFER P. ADAMS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE)

11/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

11/5/2020: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE REGARDING NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF OF JENNIFER P. ADAMS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

10/13/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE REGARDING NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF OF JENNIFER P. ADAMS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Notice - NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JENNIFER P. ADAMS

10/13/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JENNIFER P. ADAMS

Order - RULING/ORDERS

10/5/2020: Order - RULING/ORDERS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE) OF 10/05/2020

10/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE) OF 10/05/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE)

10/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE)

Notice - NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JENNIFER P. ADAMS

9/14/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JENNIFER P. ADAMS

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

8/13/2020: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC) (FURTHER); NON-APPEARANCE...) OF 07/01/2020

7/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC) (FURTHER); NON-APPEARANCE...) OF 07/01/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC) (FURTHER); NON-APPEARANCE...)

7/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC) (FURTHER); NON-APPEARANCE...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2020

4/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2020

Complaint - SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (AMENDED)

2/8/2019: Complaint - SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (AMENDED)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER (REGARDING EMERGENCY ORDER ISSUED) BASED ON CURR...) OF 03/18/2020

3/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER (REGARDING EMERGENCY ORDER ISSUED) BASED ON CURR...) OF 03/18/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER (REGARDING EMERGENCY ORDER ISSUED) BASED ON CURR...)

3/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER (REGARDING EMERGENCY ORDER ISSUED) BASED ON CURR...)

Brief - JOINT BRIEF REGARDING DEFENDANTS' INTENT TO DEMUR TO CAUSES OF ACTION ALLEGED BY PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

1/17/2020: Brief - JOINT BRIEF REGARDING DEFENDANTS' INTENT TO DEMUR TO CAUSES OF ACTION ALLEGED BY PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • Hearing11/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 9 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • Hearing07/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 9 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketOrder (Regarding Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer P. Adams); Filed by The AES Corporation (Defendant); AES Southland Energy, LLC (Defendant); AES Southland Energy Holdings II, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Application and Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer P. Adams); Filed by The AES Corporation (Defendant); AES Southland Energy, LLC (Defendant); AES Southland Energy Holdings II, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service Regarding Notice of Application and Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of of Jennifer P. Adams; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; [Proposed] Order Regarding Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice; Filed by The AES Corporation (Defendant); AES Southland Energy, LLC (Defendant); AES Southland Energy Holdings II, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketRuling/Orders; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons and Complaint); Filed by Gary Lehto (Plaintiff); Jamessa Henderson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons and Complaint); Filed by Gary Lehto (Plaintiff); Jamessa Henderson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (of Summons and Complaint); Filed by Gary Lehto (Plaintiff); Jamessa Henderson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 02/20/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gary Lehto (Plaintiff); Jamessa Henderson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gary Lehto (Plaintiff); Jamessa Henderson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AES SOUTHLAND ENERGY HOLDINGS II LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AES REDONDO BEACH L.L.C. is a litigant