This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2023 at 06:59:46 (UTC).

GARY CONRAD OTTO VS KASSABIAN DEVELOPMENTS, INC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/23/2018 GARY CONRAD OTTO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KASSABIAN DEVELOPMENTS, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK A. YOUNG and LAWRENCE CHO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9585

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK A. YOUNG

LAWRENCE CHO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OTTO GARY CONRAD

OTTO HANNA LEE

Defendants and Cross Defendants

MAYA CONSTRUCTION INC.

KASSABIAN DEVELOPMENTS INC.

S & W WATERPROOFING INC.

BUILDER AND REMODELING CONSTRUCTION

KASSABIAN DIKRAN V.

FULL PEN WELDING

OLLIN INTERNATIONAL INC.

FIRE SAFE SYSTEMS INC.

HOT STUFF SHOWERPANS INC.

KASSABIAN GERARD V.

ALAN MAXTON INC.

MIDNIGHT ELECTRIC INC.

SCOTT DAVIS PLUMBING INC.

ACTION ROOFINGS INC.

LUXURY BUILDERS LLC

DAVE'S HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING INC.

DAVE'S HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING (DOE 1)

WELDING FULL PEN

Cross Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

KASSABIAN DEVELOPMENTS INC.

HOT STUFF SHOWERPANS INC.

ALAN MAXTON INC.

LUXURY BUILDERS LLC

DAVE'S HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING INC.

46 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KENT LARRY JOEL

KAPLAN JONATHAN A.

Defendant Attorneys

JEFFERY MONA JANE

KAPLAN JEFFREY S.

FAIRCLOTH MICHAEL S.

DILTS GREGORY ALLEN

HATEM RICHARD CHARLES

ENDRES RICHARD STEPHEN

LAW OFFICE OF JENNINGS & LEGASPI

MARCUCCI GERMAN ARIEL

KIRK & MYERS

KENNEDY KEVIN PETER

ROPERS MAJESKI KOHN & BENTLEY

WYMAN SAMUEL ARNOLD

CLINTON DAVID ALLEN

RESNICK & LOUIS

Cross Defendant Attorneys

SOBEL STEVEN ALAN

LAGMAN-LEGASPI CATHERINE CLAIRE

46 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/11/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/11/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/11/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/11/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/11/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/10/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Dismissal

5/5/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

5/11/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

2/4/2022: Request for Dismissal

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LARRY KENT RE OSC RE DISMISSAL

3/3/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LARRY KENT RE OSC RE DISMISSAL

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/11/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

3/11/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Notice of Ruling

3/11/2022: Notice of Ruling

Request for Dismissal

4/18/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

4/19/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

4/22/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

4/26/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

4/27/2022: Request for Dismissal

251 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by HOT STUFF SHOWERPANS, INC. on 10/18/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by HOT STUFF SHOWERPANS, INC. as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: HOT STUFF SHOWERPANS, INC. (Cross-Complainant); As to: Moes 1-50 (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 05/13/2022 at 09:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by Wayne Petty Plastering & Son on 11/19/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Wayne Petty Plastering & Son, roes 1-20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Wayne Petty Plastering & Son (Cross-Complainant); As to: Wayne Petty Plastering & Son (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by Ultimate Installz, Inc. on 11/07/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Ultimate Installz, Inc. as to Crystal Clear Glass, Inc. and Fleetwood Windows & Doors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Ultimate Installz, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); As to: Ultimate Installz, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by DAVE'S HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING, INC. on 11/02/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by DAVE'S HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING, INC. as to ROES 1-20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- DAVE'S HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING, INC.: Organization Name changed from DAVE'S HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING, INC. to DAVE'S HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: DAVE'S HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING, INC. (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
348 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketDocument:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketDocument:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketDocument:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketDocument:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: GARY CONRAD OTTO (Plaintiff); HANNA LEE OTTO (Plaintiff); The Otto Family Inter Vivos Trust (Plaintiff); As to: ACTION ROOFINGS, INC. (Defendant); ALAN MAXTON, INC. (Defendant); BUILDER AND REMODELING CONSTRUCTION (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketCalendaring:Conference-Case Management 01/22/19 at 8:30 am Mitchell L. Beckloff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Other Intentional Tort-notPI/WD/PD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketDocument:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketDocument:Notice Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****9585    Hearing Date: November 03, 2020    Dept: M

Case Name: Gary Conrad Otto v. Kassabian Developments, Inc., et al.

Case No.: ****9585

Motion: Leave to File Third Amended Complaint (unopposed)

Hearing Date: 11/3/2020

Background

On September 29, 2020, Plaintiffs Gary Conrad Otto and Hanna Lee Otto, Trustees of The Otto Family Inter Vivos Trust, Dated October 24, 2002 (“Plaintiffs”), filed a motion for leave to file a third amended complaint (TAC). Plaintiffs included the proposed TAC as a stand alone filed document.

On July 23, 2018, Plaintiffs filed a complaint for breach of contract, breach of express warranties, breach of implied warranties and negligence related to construction defects at 32 Sixth Street, Manhattan Beach, California 90266. The complaint named the builder/developer/general Gerard V. Kassabian, (“Gerard”) and Dikran V. Kassabian, (“Dikran”), Kassabian Developments, Inc. (“Kassabian”) and Luxury Builders, LLC (“Luxury Builders”). The first amend complaint filed on August 2, 2018 also named these defendants.

Plaintiffs explain that on March 20, 2019, they filed a second amended complaint. Pursuant to an agreement between Plaintiffs’ counsel and former counsel for Gerard, Dikran, Kassabian, and Luxury Builders, Plaintiffs did not name Gerard and Dikran in the second amended complaint. However, pursuant to that agreement, the parties agreed that Plaintiffs could rename and re-serve Gerard and Dikran at a later date if the facts of case warranted such an action. (See Kent Decl. ¶ 5., Ex. A.). Plaintiffs argue that such facts have been discovered.

On October 5, 2020, Plaintiffs filed a request for dismissal of Ollin International, Inc. with prejudice. Plaintiffs seek to re-name (re-add) Defendants Gerard V. Kassabian, (“Gerard”) and Dikran V. Kassabian, (“Dikran”) and add allegations of alter ego against them as the managing agents of Defendants Kassabian Developments, Inc. (“Kassabian”) and Luxury Builders, LLC (“Luxury Builders”).

Legal Standard

“The court may, in furtherance of justice, and on any terms as may be proper, allow a party to amend any pleading or proceeding by adding or striking out the name of any party, or by correcting a mistake in the name of a party, or a mistake in any other respect.” (Code Civ. Proc., ; 473.) California Code of Civil Procedure section 576 also grants the court power to allow a party to amend its pleading.

California courts are required to permit liberal amendment of pleadings in the interest of justice between the parties to an action. (Dieckmann v. Superior Court (1985) 175 Cal.App.3d 345, 352.) Generally, amendment must be permitted unless there is unwarranted delay in requesting leave to amend or undue prejudice to the opposing party. (Duchrow v. Forrest (2013) 215 Cal.App.4th 1359, 1377.) Even if a good amendment is proposed in proper form, unwarranted delay in presenting it may – of itself—be a valid reason for denial. (Emerald Bay Community Association v. Golden Eagle Ins. Corp. (2005) 130 Cal.App.4th 1078, 1097.)

Analysis

As noted above, Plaintiffs seek to re-name Defendants Gerard and Dikran as well as to add alter ego allegations. Plaintiffs explain that they initially agreed to dismiss these defendants because Luxury Builders and Kassabian had told Plaintiffs that they had sufficient insurance to cover Gerard and Dikran. However, Plaintiffs argue that after discovery there is a substantial likelihood that the insurance would not cover Gerard and Dikran.

Plaintiffs also argue that discovery that was stayed. Plaintiffs point to a case management order in support of this argument. The case management order of August 2019 does not state that a stay was ever imposed or lifted on June 26, 2020. The revised CMO listed June 22, 2020 as the trial date and May 22, 2020 as the discovery cutoff. (See 09/04/2019 Notice of entry of order re: revised CMO timeline.) Plaintiffs argue that Defendants would not be prejudiced because they could conduct discovery on the issues raised by the TAC. However, it appears that the discovery cutoff has passed.

While the motion is unopposed, the Court is concerned that Plaintiff’s have not demonstrated a lack of prejudice due to discovery being closed. Therefore, the motion to file a TAC is tentatively denied.