Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2020 at 11:42:26 (UTC).

GARY COHEN VS LILY GORDON

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 GARY COHEN filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LILY GORDON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9396

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COHEN GARY

Defendant

GORDON LILY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARPEL DONALD E

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/21/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2023
  • Hearing05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Hearing11/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Hearing11/04/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gary Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gary Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gary Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KARPEL DONALD E. ESQ.