This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2021 at 16:12:19 (UTC).

GARY CAINE, TRUSTEE OF THE CAINE FAMILY TRUST VS LYNNE T LEAR, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 GARY CAINE, TRUSTEE OF THE CAINE FAMILY TRUST filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LYNNE T LEAR, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0066

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAINE TRUSTEE OF THE CAINE FAMILY TRUST GARY

Defendants

STRAND HILL PROPERTIES

LEAR AN INDIVIDUAL LYNNE T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GHOLIAN ARTIN

Defendant Attorney

O'MEARA FRANCES M.

 

Court Documents

Answer

6/7/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/7/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

6/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Case Management Statement

5/20/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/20/2021: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MAILING

3/4/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MAILING

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/4/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration re: Due Diligence

3/4/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/9/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/25/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/10/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration re: Due Diligence

2/10/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

2/4/2021: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/1/2021: Complaint

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2022
  • Hearing10/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • Hearing10/05/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • Hearing06/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Gary Caine, Trustee Of The Caine Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 06/22/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Lynne T Lear, An Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Lynne T Lear, An Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Failure to File Proof of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Gary Caine, Trustee Of The Caine Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Gary Caine, Trustee Of The Caine Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Mailing); Filed by Gary Caine, Trustee Of The Caine Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Gary Caine, Trustee Of The Caine Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gary Caine, Trustee Of The Caine Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gary Caine, Trustee Of The Caine Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gary Caine, Trustee Of The Caine Family Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GHOLIAN ARTIN