This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/12/2021 at 04:00:01 (UTC).

GARY BERNSTEIN AS TRUSTEE OF THE BERNSTEIN FAMILY TRUST UDT 10/22/04 VS MARY ANN CONNER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 GARY BERNSTEIN AS TRUSTEE OF THE BERNSTEIN FAMILY TRUST UDT 10/22/04 filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against MARY ANN CONNER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1410

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARY BERNSTEIN AS TRUSTEE OF THE BERNSTEIN FAMILY TRUST UDT

ANITA KAY BERNSTEIN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE BERNSTEIN FAMILY TRUST UDT

Defendants

SANBORN NANCY

BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESERVICES CALIFORNIA PROPERTIES

CONNER MARY ANN

PICKFORD REAL ESTATE INC. DBA BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESERVICES CALIFORNIA PROPERTIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GROSSMAN BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/5/2021: Request for Dismissal

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

3/26/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement

3/26/2021: Notice of Settlement

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

12/1/2020: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/1/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/1/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/1/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/1/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

10/1/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ANITA KAY BERNSTEIN, individually and as Trustee of the Bernstein Family Trust UDT 10/22/04, (Plaintiff); Gary Bernstein as Trustee of the Bernstein Family Trust UDT 10/22/04 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by ANITA KAY BERNSTEIN, individually and as Trustee of the Bernstein Family Trust UDT 10/22/04, (Plaintiff); Gary Bernstein as Trustee of the Bernstein Family Trust UDT 10/22/04 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint ((1st)); Filed by Gary Bernstein as Trustee of the Bernstein Family Trust UDT 10/22/04 (Plaintiff); ANITA KAY BERNSTEIN, individually and as Trustee of the Bernstein Family Trust UDT 10/22/04, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gary Bernstein as Trustee of the Bernstein Family Trust UDT 10/22/04 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gary Bernstein as Trustee of the Bernstein Family Trust UDT 10/22/04 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gary Bernstein as Trustee of the Bernstein Family Trust UDT 10/22/04 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESERVICES CALIFORNIA PROPERTIES is a litigant

Latest cases where Pickford Real Estate , INC; DBA : Berkshire Hathaway Homeservices California Properties is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GROSSMAN BRIAN