This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/25/2020 at 06:32:31 (UTC).

GARY B. BERNSTEIN, TRUSTEE, ET AL. VS RODNEY J. DAWSON, TRUSTEE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/15/2020 GARY B BERNSTEIN, TRUSTEE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against RODNEY J DAWSON, TRUSTEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8547

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BERNSTEIN ANITA KAY TRUSTEE

BERNSTEIN GARY B. TRUSTEE

Defendants

CARO-DAWSON VICTORIA TRUSTEE

DAWSON RODNEY J. TRUSTEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CUNNINGHAM FRANCIS JOSEPH III

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/15/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/15/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/15/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/15/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/19/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/19/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

6/16/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/16/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

7/15/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/25/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/25/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

9/10/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

11/23/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

11/20/2020: Request for Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Gary B. Bernstein, Trustee (Plaintiff); Anita Kay Bernstein, Trustee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Gary B. Bernstein, Trustee (Plaintiff); Anita Kay Bernstein, Trustee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance of Case Management Conference); Filed by Gary B. Bernstein, Trustee (Plaintiff); Anita Kay Bernstein, Trustee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Gary B. Bernstein, Trustee (Plaintiff); Anita Kay Bernstein, Trustee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Filing of Notice of Pendency of Action); Filed by Gary B. Bernstein, Trustee (Plaintiff); Anita Kay Bernstein, Trustee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Gary B. Bernstein, Trustee (Plaintiff); Anita Kay Bernstein, Trustee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Gary B. Bernstein, Trustee (Plaintiff); Anita Kay Bernstein, Trustee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Gary B. Bernstein, Trustee (Plaintiff); Anita Kay Bernstein, Trustee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gary B. Bernstein, Trustee (Plaintiff); Anita Kay Bernstein, Trustee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gary B. Bernstein, Trustee (Plaintiff); Anita Kay Bernstein, Trustee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gary B. Bernstein, Trustee (Plaintiff); Anita Kay Bernstein, Trustee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CUNNINGHAM FRANCIS J. III ESQ.