This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/10/2022 at 12:40:51 (UTC).

GARRY WILLIS VS LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER & POWER

Case Summary

On 10/17/2022 GARRY WILLIS filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER POWER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3704

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIS GARRY

Defendant

LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER & POWER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GHENCIU VLAD R

SHAGRAMANOV VLADIMIR

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/17/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/17/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

10/17/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

10/17/2022: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

10/17/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

10/17/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Proof of Personal Service

11/8/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2024
  • Hearing10/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2024
  • Hearing04/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2024
  • Hearing04/02/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: GARRY WILLIS (Plaintiff); As to: LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER & POWER (Defendant); Service Date: 11/02/2022; Service Cost: 163.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 10/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 04/02/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: GARRY WILLIS (Plaintiff); As to: LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER & POWER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: GARRY WILLIS (Plaintiff); As to: LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER & POWER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: GARRY WILLIS (Plaintiff); As to: LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER & POWER (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAGRAMANOV VLADIMIR

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GHENCIU VLAD RAUL