This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 01:06:32 (UTC).

GARDENA HOSPITAL LP ET AL VS DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVI

Case Summary

On 02/27/2018 GARDENA HOSPITAL LP filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2638

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

FOOTHILL HOSPITAL-MORRIS L. JOHNSTON

JOHN MUIR HEALTH

WALNUT CREEK

EAST LOS ANGELES DOCTORS HOSPITAL

MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF GARDENA

GARDENA HOSPITAL L.P.

FOOTHILL PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL

JOHN MUIR MEDICAL CENTER

CREEK WALNUT

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-25

DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

STEPHENSON JOY YOUNG ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

NICOLE J. KAU DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

2/27/2018: PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

3/2/2018: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

3/15/2018: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

4/12/2018: ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

Notice

5/20/2019: Notice

Stipulation and Order

5/14/2019: Stipulation and Order

Notice

11/15/2018: Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/7/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order

6/8/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF DENIAL OF STIPULATION TO VACATE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; TO SET WRIT HEARING DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE

5/17/2018: NOTICE OF DENIAL OF STIPULATION TO VACATE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; TO SET WRIT HEARING DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE

Minute Order

5/10/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Service

4/30/2018: Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • at 09:32 AM in Department 86; Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 86; Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Notice (of Stipulation to Continue Writ Hearing Date and to Set New Briefing Schedule; Order Thereon); Filed by Gardena Hospital, L.P. (Plaintiff); Memorial Hospital Of Gardena (Legacy Party); Foothill Hospital-Morris L. Johnston (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO CONTINUE WRIT HEARING DATE TO SET NEW BRIEFING SCHEDULE; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON); Filed by Gardena Hospital, L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Notice (of Case Reassignment); Filed by Gardena Hospital, L.P. (Plaintiff); Foothill Hospital-Morris L. Johnston (Plaintiff); East Los Angeles Doctors Hospital (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 86; Trial Setting Conference (Trial Setting Conference; Trial Date Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-06-08 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • NOTICE OF DENIAL OF STIPULATION TO VACATE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; TO SET WRIT HEARING DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2018
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Gardena Hospital, L.P. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • ANSWER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Answer; Filed by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Gardena Hospital, L.P. (Plaintiff); Memorial Hospital Of Gardena (Legacy Party); Foothill Hospital-Morris L. Johnston (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOOTHILL PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where GARDENA HOSPITAL L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where GARDENA HOSPITAL L.P. DBA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF GARDENA is a litigant

Latest cases where EMANATE HEALTH FOOTHILL PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL is a litigant