This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/23/2021 at 21:18:27 (UTC).

GARDENA HOSPITAL, L.P., A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, ET AL. VS SCAN HEALTH PLAN, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/28/2020 GARDENA HOSPITAL, L P , A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SCAN HEALTH PLAN, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3013

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARDENA HOSPITAL L.P. A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

CHHP HOLDINGS II LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CPH HOSPITAL MANAGEMENT LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ELADH L.P. A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

SCAN HEALTH PLAN A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LOCAL INITIATIVE HEALTH AUTHORITY FOR LOS ANGELES COUNTY DBA L.A. CARE HEALTH PLAN A PUBLIC ENTITY

HEALTH NET MEDICAL

MOLINA HEALTHCARE OF CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CARE FIRST INC DBA CARE FIRST HEALTH PLAN A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

HEALTH NET OF CALIFORNIA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA DBA ANTHEM BLUE CROSS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WELLCARE HEALTH PLANS OF CALIFORNIA INC DBA EASY CHOICE HEALTH PLAN INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

UHC OF CALIFORNIA DBA UNITED HEALTHCARE OF CALIFORNIA ACALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ALIGNMENT HEALTH PLAN A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CALIFORNIA PHYSICIANS SERVICE DBA BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION

HUMANA HEALTH PLAN OF CALIFORNIA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LOCAL INITIATIVE HEATH AUTHORITY FOR LOS ANGELES COUNTY DBA L.A. CARE HEALTH PLAN

HUMANA HEALTH PLAN OF CALIFORNIA INC.

CALIFORNIA PHYSICIANS' SERVICE DBA BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WENTLAND ADAM G ESQ.

WENTLAND ADAM G

Defendant Attorneys

MAYBERRY LISA

NGUYEN JENNA UYEN

WESTERFELD BRYAN

WOOD NATHANIAL J.

ZORKIN MICHAEL

FULLER CHAD R

ALBERTS RONALD K.

DECKER RICHARD JEFFREY

JONES DAVID

KLEIN ELISE DALE

ROAN PETER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • Hearing11/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Hearing11/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Blue Cross of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Gardena Hospital, L.P. (Plaintiff); ELADH, L.P. (Plaintiff); CPH Hospital Management, LLC (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketStipulation to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint; Filed by Blue Shield of California promise Health Plan Erroneously Sued As Care First, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketStipulation To Set Aside Default; Filed by Blue Shield of California promise Health Plan Erroneously Sued As Care First, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketOrder (on Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint); Filed by Blue Shield of California promise Health Plan Erroneously Sued As Care First, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketOrder (Proposed Order Granting Stipulation); Filed by Blue Shield of California promise Health Plan Erroneously Sued As Care First, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketFifth Stipulation To Extend Time For Defendant Blue Cross Of California Dba Anthem Blue Cross To Respond To The Amended Complaint; Filed by Blue Cross of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Gardena Hospital, L.P., a Limited partnership (Plaintiff); ELADH, L.P., a limited partnership (Plaintiff); CPH HOSPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Gardena Hospital, L.P., a Limited partnership (Plaintiff); ELADH, L.P., a limited partnership (Plaintiff); CPH HOSPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Gardena Hospital, L.P., a Limited partnership (Plaintiff); ELADH, L.P., a limited partnership (Plaintiff); CPH HOSPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gardena Hospital, L.P., a Limited partnership (Plaintiff); ELADH, L.P., a limited partnership (Plaintiff); CPH HOSPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gardena Hospital, L.P., a Limited partnership (Plaintiff); ELADH, L.P., a limited partnership (Plaintiff); CPH HOSPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gardena Hospital, L.P., a Limited partnership (Plaintiff); ELADH, L.P., a limited partnership (Plaintiff); CPH HOSPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC, a limited liability company (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELADH L.P. A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where HUMANA HEALTH PLAN OF CALIFORNIA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ALIGNMENT HEALTH PLAN A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CPH HOSPITAL MANAGEMENT LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant