This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/18/2020 at 01:06:20 (UTC).

GARCIA, KENNY ELIZABETH VS GARCIA, HEINZ

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 GARCIA, KENNY ELIZABETH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GARCIA, HEINZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0089

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GARCIA KENNY ELIZABETH

Respondent

GARCIA HEINZ

 

Court Documents

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

2/11/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - UCCJEA

2/11/2020: Declaration - UCCJEA

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

2/11/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Summons

2/14/2020: Summons

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied FW003

2/14/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied FW003

Proof of Service of Summons - Service date - 02/26/2020

3/12/2020: Proof of Service of Summons - Service date - 02/26/2020

Proof of Service of Summons - Service date - 02/26/2020

3/12/2020: Proof of Service of Summons - Service date - 02/26/2020

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

3/12/2020: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Judgment Package Received - FC2336 - Rejected on 05/01/2020

4/23/2020: Judgment Package Received - FC2336 - Rejected on 05/01/2020

Request - Enter Default FL165 - Filed and Entered

4/23/2020: Request - Enter Default FL165 - Filed and Entered

Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure

4/23/2020: Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure

Declaration - Default FL170

4/23/2020: Declaration - Default FL170

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336 (Rejected on 05/01/2020 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165 (Filed and Entered ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Service date - 02/26/2020 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.