This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2022 at 08:19:38 (UTC).

GARCIA, CECELIA J. - CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 12/30/2021 GARCIA, CECELIA J - CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOGDANOFF, LEE R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2292

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOGDANOFF, LEE R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROMERO TERI

Conservator

ROMERO TERESITA

Not Classified By Court

GARCIA CECELIA J.

ELLIS STEPHEN

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Interested Party

REYES AUGUSTINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservator and Petitioner Attorney

ROGERS JOHN EARL

Not Classified By Court Attorney

KANIN MATTHEW DAVID

Interested Party Attorney

LUFTMAN RICHARD ALLEN

 

Court Documents

Duties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook - Duties of Conservator (Comment)

4/20/2022: Duties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook - Duties of Conservator (Comment)

Order - Appointing Conservator

5/3/2022: Order - Appointing Conservator

Notice - Conservatee's Rights - Notice - Conservatee's Rights

5/4/2022: Notice - Conservatee's Rights - Notice - Conservatee's Rights

Letters (Initial) - Conservatorship

5/5/2022: Letters (Initial) - Conservatorship

Bond - Liberty Mutual

5/5/2022: Bond - Liberty Mutual

Conservatorship Care Plan/Determination - Determination of Conservatees Appropriate Level of Care

5/12/2022: Conservatorship Care Plan/Determination - Determination of Conservatees Appropriate Level of Care

Request - Special Notice

5/23/2022: Request - Special Notice

Proof - Mailing - Court Investigation Report

2/16/2022: Proof - Mailing - Court Investigation Report

Minute Order

3/10/2022: Minute Order

Citation - Citation with proof of service

2/22/2022: Citation - Citation with proof of service

Report - Court Appointed Counsel - CAC Report re Cecelia Garcia, Proposed C'ee (Uncontested)

3/4/2022: Report - Court Appointed Counsel - CAC Report re Cecelia Garcia, Proposed C'ee (Uncontested)

Supplement - to Petition

3/7/2022: Supplement - to Petition

Doctor's Capacity Declaration

12/30/2021: Doctor's Capacity Declaration

Petition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Initial)

12/30/2021: Petition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Initial)

PR_General Probate - PR-Appointment Order Professional Appointee Court Expense -

1/4/2022: PR_General Probate - PR-Appointment Order Professional Appointee Court Expense -

Citation - Issued

12/30/2021: Citation - Issued

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2023
  • Hearing05/18/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketRequest - Special Notice; Filed by Interested Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketConservatorship Care Plan/Determination (Determination of Conservatees Appropriate Level of Care ); Filed by Conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketLetters (Initial) - Conservatorship; Filed by Conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketBond (Liberty Mutual ); Filed by Conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketNotice - Conservatee's Rights (Notice - Conservatee's Rights ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketDuties of Conservator/Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook (Duties of Conservator (Comment) ); Filed by Conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Conservator - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketCAC Appointment Required

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketPetition - Appoint Conservator of P&E (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketCitation (Issued ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Info Sheet; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketDoctor's Capacity Declaration; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUFTMAN RICHARD ALLEN