This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/01/2021 at 22:57:36 (UTC).

GARCIA, ASHLEY VS RUBILAR, ANDREW

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 GARCIA, ASHLEY filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against RUBILAR, ANDREW. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SANCHEZ, JAMES and PACHECO, RANDALL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1143

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SANCHEZ, JAMES

PACHECO, RANDALL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GARCIA ASHLEY

Respondent

RUBILAR ANDREW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KIM CAROLINE S

Respondent Attorney

KOZICH S. DAVID

 

Court Documents

Declaration

9/28/2021: Declaration

Proof of Service - Mail - Re: FL-150

9/14/2021: Proof of Service - Mail - Re: FL-150

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

9/10/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

9/10/2021: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Declaration - Income and Expense

9/13/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Minute Order

9/10/2021: Minute Order

Reply - Petitioner's reply to respondent's response to her request for domestic violene restraining order

9/3/2021: Reply - Petitioner's reply to respondent's response to her request for domestic violene restraining order

Proof of Service

8/13/2021: Proof of Service

Minute Order

8/17/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/17/2021: Minute Order

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

8/17/2021: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

FL_Minute Order - Family Master Minute Order

8/17/2021: FL_Minute Order - Family Master Minute Order

Notice - Limited Scope Representation

8/17/2021: Notice - Limited Scope Representation

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

8/17/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

7/26/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

7/26/2021: Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

7/26/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

7/26/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • Hearing10/04/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department S16 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Restraining Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (Re: FL-150 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S16, Pacheco, Randall, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketReply (Petitioner's reply to respondent's response to her request for domestic violene restraining order ); Filed by Limited Scope Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketResponse - Domestic Violence; Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOZICH S. DAVID