This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2022 at 12:28:07 (UTC).

GARCIA, ALISON DAYANA OROZCO - GUARDIANSHIP

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 GARCIA, ALISON DAYANA OROZCO - GUARDIANSHIP was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SMALL, MICHAEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3351

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SMALL, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GARCIA ALISON DAYANA OROZCO

Interested Parties

HERNANDEZ MAYRA SOFIA

HERNANDEZ NITZI CRISTINA

HERNANDEZ OROZCO ELIZON

HERNANDEZ SAMANTHA LIZBETH

OROZCO GARCIA KIMBERLY ESTHER

SANCHEZ AMAYA

Not Classified By Court

MUNOZ HERNANDEZ ELIZON

MUNOZ SALVATIERRA ROSA DEL CARMEN

OROZCO GARCIA ERIKA LIZBETH

MONROY ROSA ISELA BETANZOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MEZA CONTRERAS NATHALIE

 

Court Documents

Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211)

8/17/2022: Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211)

Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211)

8/17/2022: Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211)

Notice - Hearing - Proof of Service

8/17/2022: Notice - Hearing - Proof of Service

Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211) - Consent/Nomination/Waiver

8/17/2022: Consent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211) - Consent/Nomination/Waiver

Declaration of Due Diligence

8/17/2022: Declaration of Due Diligence

Letters (Initial)

9/1/2022: Letters (Initial)

Duties of Guardian

9/1/2022: Duties of Guardian

Order - Appointing Guardian - Person Only

9/1/2022: Order - Appointing Guardian - Person Only

Minute Order

9/1/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/1/2022: Minute Order

Miscellaneous Document - Request For Copies

6/9/2022: Miscellaneous Document - Request For Copies

Minute Order

6/15/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/15/2022: Minute Order

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

4/4/2022: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Ex Parte - Petition to Appoint Temporary Guardian

4/4/2022: Ex Parte - Petition to Appoint Temporary Guardian

Order - Prescribing Notice

4/4/2022: Order - Prescribing Notice

Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial)

4/4/2022: Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial)

Declaration

4/4/2022: Declaration

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Guardian - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Special Immigrant Juvenile Status Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketPetition Granted (Petition - Special Immigrant Juvenile Findings filed on April 4, 2022 by Alison Dayana Orozco Garcia )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketPetition Granted (Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial) filed on April 4, 2022 by Alison Dayana Orozco Garcia. )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Nominee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketDuties of Guardian; Filed by Nominee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketEx Parte - Petition to Appoint Temporary Guardian; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketPetition - Special Immigrant Juvenile Findings; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketConsent/Nomination/Waiver (GC-211); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketPetition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketOrder - Prescribing Notice; Filed by Minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathalie Meza Contreras