Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 04:36:59 (UTC).

GARABEDYAN, TIGRAN - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 GARABEDYAN, TIGRAN - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAY, GUS T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5178

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAY, GUS T.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

SIROUNIAN SONA

BABAYAN GOURGEN

Claimants

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

HARO GINA

LEON NICHOLAS

CAPITAL ONE

MIRZAKHANYAN TINA

YAGUBYAN SUSANNA

Decedent

GARABEDYAN TIGRAN

Not Classified By Court

MOORE ANTHONY

WALLACE MARGARET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

LUDWIG MITCHELL BRIAN

LALAZARIAN DAVID

BELTRAN STEVEN PATRICK ESQ

Claimant Attorneys

MCANDREW STEPHEN FRANCIS

ZABETIAN ARASH H.

KESHISHIAN ARNO HILL

 

Court Documents

Withdrawal - Creditor's Claim

5/26/2021: Withdrawal - Creditor's Claim

Creditor's Claim - $ = TBD

5/24/2021: Creditor's Claim - $ = TBD

Spousal/Domestic Partner Property Petition - No Fee - Petition for Spousal/Domestic Partnership Property (No Fee)

5/21/2021: Spousal/Domestic Partner Property Petition - No Fee - Petition for Spousal/Domestic Partnership Property (No Fee)

Creditor's Claim

4/12/2021: Creditor's Claim

Request - Special Notice

4/12/2021: Request - Special Notice

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

3/9/2021: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection

3/15/2021: PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection

Supplement - Supplement to Clear Probate Notes

2/2/2021: Supplement - Supplement to Clear Probate Notes

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

1/22/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

12/29/2020: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Request - Special Notice

11/30/2020: Request - Special Notice

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

9/16/2020: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Petition - Letters of Administration (Subsequent) - Amended Petition for Letters of Administration and Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act

9/8/2020: Petition - Letters of Administration (Subsequent) - Amended Petition for Letters of Administration and Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act

Ex Parte - Order

9/14/2020: Ex Parte - Order

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

7/24/2020: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Amended

7/8/2020: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Amended

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

7/7/2020: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • Hearing08/08/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • Hearing10/08/2021 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Spousal Property Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketPetition Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketInventory & Appraisal (Reappraisal for Sale ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCreditor's Claim ($ = TBD ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCreditor's Claim (Amount Unknown ); Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketWithdrawal - Creditor's Claim; Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketLetters - Special Administrator; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Special Administrator (with Special Powers; Letters will Expire on 11/30/2020 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Amended ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketPetition - Letters Special Admin w/o Gen Powers (Subsequent) (Ex Parte ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketEx Parte - Application ((Appearing 7/9/2020) for Order Appointing Dr. Sona Sirounian, O.D., as Special Administrator of the Estate of Tigran Garabedyan and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Thereof; Declarations of Sona Sirounian and Brigeli Westerband, M.D., in Support; and Declaration of Mitchell B. Ludwig in Support and Re: Notice ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Subsequent (PRO 037)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL ONE N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCANDREW STEPHEN FRANCIS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZABETIAN ARASH H.