Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2020 at 04:52:35 (UTC).

GAO, ZHENGBOYANG VS ZHAO, AI

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 GAO, ZHENGBOYANG filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against ZHAO, AI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARTELLA, TIMOTHY and GIZA, ALEXANDER C.D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0200

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARTELLA, TIMOTHY

GIZA, ALEXANDER C.D.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GAO ZHENGBOYANG

Respondent

ZHAO AI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MARTICORENA CASEY J

Respondent Attorney

GREEN JAMES BRADLEY

 

Court Documents

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

2/13/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

2/13/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

2/13/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

2/13/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

2/13/2020: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Proof of Service

2/21/2020: Proof of Service

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

3/4/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

3/4/2020: Minute Order

Proof of Service

3/4/2020: Proof of Service

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

3/4/2020: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Substitution of Attorney

3/4/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

4/10/2020: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Stipulation and Order - No Fee - Stipulation and Order Continuing the Hearing on Petitioner's Request for Restraining Order, Attorneys' Fees and Other Orders

4/10/2020: Stipulation and Order - No Fee - Stipulation and Order Continuing the Hearing on Petitioner's Request for Restraining Order, Attorneys' Fees and Other Orders

Minute Order

4/10/2020: Minute Order

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • Hearing08/13/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department S at 300 East Walnut St., Pasadena, CA 91101; Restraining Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S, Giza, Alexander C.D., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Not Held - Continued by Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order - No Fee (Stipulation and Order Continuing the Hearing on Petitioner's Request for Restraining Order, Attorneys' Fees and Other Orders ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S, Martella, Timothy, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN JAMES B