*******4062
10/21/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Contract - Other Contract
Los Angeles, California
BRUCE G. IWASAKI
JAMES C. CHALFANT
DING GANG
AMERICAN BD INVESTMENT GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
HUI KIN
CHU WILLIAM
BDK CAPITAL LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
SINGPOLI CAPITAL CORPORATION A NEVADA CORPORATION
SINGPOLI MILPITAS LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
KIM PHILIP Y.
GAMARNIK KEVIN DAVID
HALLOCK KAREN LEE
8/28/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL NON-PARTY AMERICAN GENERAL DESIGN TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO A DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORD
8/7/2023: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
8/7/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KEVIN D. GAMARNIK IN SUPPORT OF CROSSCOMPLAINANT SINGPOLI MILPITAS, LPS MOTION TO COMPEL NONPARTY AMERICAN GENERAL DESIGN TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO A DEPOSITION SU
5/15/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)
5/10/2023: Case Management Statement
5/1/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) CORRECTED
4/28/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
4/28/2023: Case Management Statement
4/24/2023: Answer
4/18/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING TAKEN OFF-CALENDAR ON PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR A WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AND A RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AGAINST DEFENDANTS KIN HUI AND WILLIAM CHU
4/14/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR A WRIT OF ATTACHMENT AND A RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AGAINST DEFENDANTS KIN HUI AND WILLIAM CHU
4/14/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: HEARING ON RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER TAKEN OFF CA...)
4/11/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KIN HUI IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR A WRIT OF ATTACHMENT
4/11/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT KIN HUIS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF GANG DINGS APPLICATION FOR A WRIT OF ATTACHMENT
4/11/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF WILLIAM CHU IN SUPPORT OF HIS OPPOSITION TO WRIT OF ATTACHMENT
4/11/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S WRIT OF ATTACHMENT
4/3/2023: Answer
3/24/2023: Proof of Service by Mail
Hearing04/07/2025 at 09:00 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial
[-] Read LessHearing04/01/2025 at 09:00 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference
[-] Read LessHearing10/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference
[-] Read LessDocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 09/25/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 58 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 09/11/2023
[-] Read LessDocketNotice OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL NON-PARTY AMERICAN GENERAL DESIGN TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO A DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORD; Filed by: Kin Hui (Cross-Complainant); As to: SINGPOLI MILPITAS, LP, a California limited partnership (Cross-Complainant)
[-] Read LessDocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 09/25/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 58
[-] Read LessDocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion; Filed by: Kin Hui (Defendant); As to: Gang Ding (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketDeclaration OF KEVIN D. GAMARNIK IN SUPPORT OF CROSSCOMPLAINANT SINGPOLI MILPITAS, LPS MOTION TO COMPEL NONPARTY AMERICAN GENERAL DESIGN TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO A DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRO; Filed by: Kin Hui (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketStatus Conference scheduled for 10/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 58
[-] Read LessDocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 04/01/2025 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 58
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 58
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: Gang Ding (Plaintiff); As to: Kin Hui (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Gang Ding (Plaintiff); As to: Kin Hui (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Gang Ding (Plaintiff); As to: Kin Hui (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Bruce G. Iwasaki in Department 58 Stanley Mosk Courthouse
[-] Read Less