Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/10/2021 at 00:58:52 (UTC).

GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY VS BA CONSTRUCT, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BA CONSTRUCT, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9588

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY

Defendants

CRAWFORD REAL ESTATE SERVICES INC.

MONSALUD ERICSON

BA CONSTRUCT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

FILER NORMAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/20/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/29/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • Hearing04/29/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ganahl Lumber Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ganahl Lumber Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ganahl Lumber Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ganahl Lumber Company is a litigant