This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 05:25:49 (UTC).

GAMEROS, RACHEL CECILIA VS MARTIN, TONI JENEA

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 GAMEROS, RACHEL CECILIA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MARTIN, TONI JENEA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0861

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GAMEROS RACHEL CECILIA

Respondent

MARTIN TONI JENEA

 

Court Documents

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

7/16/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

7/16/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record

1/31/2022: Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record

Notice - Entry of Judgment

1/14/2022: Notice - Entry of Judgment

Judgment

1/14/2022: Judgment

Declaration - Default FL170

1/7/2022: Declaration - Default FL170

Request - Enter Default FL165

1/4/2022: Request - Enter Default FL165

Proof of Service of Summons - Amended

1/4/2022: Proof of Service of Summons - Amended

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

12/27/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Proof of Service of Summons - Incomplete Due to No Signature of Respondent on Certified Mail Receipt

12/27/2021: Proof of Service of Summons - Incomplete Due to No Signature of Respondent on Certified Mail Receipt

Petition - Dissolution - Domestic Partners w/o Minor Child

7/16/2021: Petition - Dissolution - Domestic Partners w/o Minor Child

Summons

7/16/2021: Summons

Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property - and separeate property

7/16/2021: Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property - and separeate property

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

7/16/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Mail - Returned Mail - Respondent; Request to enter default

7/8/2022: Mail - Returned Mail - Respondent; Request to enter default

Mail - Returned Mail - Toni Martin

7/5/2022: Mail - Returned Mail - Toni Martin

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketMail - Returned Mail (Respondent; Request to enter default )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketMail - Returned Mail (Toni Martin )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Amended ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Incomplete Due to No Signature of Respondent on Certified Mail Receipt ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property (and separeate property ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution - Domestic Partners w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less