This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/23/2021 at 03:02:47 (UTC).

GALOYAN, SERGEY - MINOR'S COMPROMISE

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 GALOYAN, SERGEY - MINOR'S COMPROMISE was filed as a Probate - Minor Compromise Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0861

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Minor Compromise Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GALOYAN ARMAN

Not Classified By Court

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BELORYAN HAIK ARMEN

 

Court Documents

Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited)

2/1/2021: Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited)

Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Expedited)

2/1/2021: Proposed Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Expedited)

Proposed Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

2/1/2021: Proposed Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

2/16/2021: Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Expedited)

2/16/2021: Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Expedited)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • Hearing05/11/2021 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 5 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketOrder - Approving Compromise of Claim (Expedited)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketOrder - Deposit Funds Expedited

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDISP: Expedited Minor's Compromise Approved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketProposed Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address; Filed by Minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketPetition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Minor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BELORYAN HAIK ARMEN