This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/04/2021 at 12:25:16 (UTC).

GALLEGOS, LILIANA VS GALLEGOS, IVAN

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 GALLEGOS, LILIANA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GALLEGOS, IVAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VEASEY, GLENDA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1201

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VEASEY, GLENDA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GALLEGOS LILIANA

Respondent

GALLEGOS IVAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FRENCH NICOLE

Respondent Attorney

PATHAK SURESH CHAND

 

Court Documents

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

12/24/2020: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Hrg 01/19/21 Dept J 8:30am

12/24/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Hrg 01/19/21 Dept J 8:30am

Proof of Service

12/17/2020: Proof of Service

Response - Domestic Violence

12/18/2020: Response - Domestic Violence

Proof of Service - Mail

12/18/2020: Proof of Service - Mail

Exhibit List

12/18/2020: Exhibit List

Declaration - Income and Expense

12/18/2020: Declaration - Income and Expense

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

12/4/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

12/4/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Request - DV Prevention w/Minor Child (w/in Existing Case)

12/4/2020: Request - DV Prevention w/Minor Child (w/in Existing Case)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - -Granted

12/4/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - -Granted

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

12/4/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

Declaration - Income and Expense

12/4/2020: Declaration - Income and Expense

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

11/25/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Summons

11/25/2020: Summons

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

11/25/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

11/25/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

11/25/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • Hearing01/19/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department J at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Restraining Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department J, Veasey, Glenda, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) (Hrg 01/19/21 Dept J 8:30am ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (-Granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less