This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2022 at 00:01:31 (UTC).

GALLAGHER BASSETT SERVICES INC. VS PEDRO MARNOLEJO HERNANDEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/28/2022 GALLAGHER BASSETT SERVICES INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PEDRO MARNOLEJO HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARGARET MILLER BERNAL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0224

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALLAGHER BASSETT SERVICES INC.

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

FLOREZ FIDELIA RUIZ

HERNANDEZ PEDRO MARNOLEJO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BIANCHI CHRISTOPHER GEORGE

JEMMOTT WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/29/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/28/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/28/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/28/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/28/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/16/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Case Management Statement

7/13/2022: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/13/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/29/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • Hearing10/31/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by GALLAGHER BASSETT SERVICES INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by GALLAGHER BASSETT SERVICES INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by GALLAGHER BASSETT SERVICES INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by GALLAGHER BASSETT SERVICES INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by GALLAGHER BASSETT SERVICES INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by GALLAGHER BASSETT SERVICES INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gallagher Bassett Services is a litigant