This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2021 at 17:36:01 (UTC).

GALINA SHEPEL VS RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/26/2017 GALINA SHEPEL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BENNY C. OSORIO, DEBORAH L. CHRISTIAN, STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH, MICHAEL E. WHITAKER and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0094

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BENNY C. OSORIO

DEBORAH L. CHRISTIAN

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

SHEPEL GALINA

Respondents and Defendants

THE KROGER CO

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

DOES 1 TO 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

HAKIM SHARONA ESLAMBOLY ESQ.

ESLAMBOLY-HAKIM SHARONA ESLAMBOLY ESQ.

LAKHCHAKOVA DIANA G.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

STONE GREGORY E. ESQ.

STONE GREGORY EDWARD ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER AUGMENT) OF 06/22/2021

6/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER AUGMENT) OF 06/22/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER AUGMENT)

6/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER AUGMENT)

Motion to Augment - MOTION TO AUGMENT DIANA LAKHCHAKOVA

7/7/2021: Motion to Augment - MOTION TO AUGMENT DIANA LAKHCHAKOVA

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF SECOND CONTINUANCE OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE

7/13/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF SECOND CONTINUANCE OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

7/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC)) OF 07/16/2021

7/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC)) OF 07/16/2021

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE TO AUGMENT EXPERT WITNESS LIST

5/28/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE TO AUGMENT EXPERT WITNESS LIST

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO A...)

6/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO A...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AUGMENT EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION

6/1/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AUGMENT EXPERT WITNESS DESIGNATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING)

6/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING) OF 06/02/2021

6/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING) OF 06/02/2021

Motion to Augment - MOTION TO AUGMENT DIANA LAKHCHAKOVA

5/27/2021: Motion to Augment - MOTION TO AUGMENT DIANA LAKHCHAKOVA

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS IN LIMINES NOS. 1-5

3/8/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS IN LIMINES NOS. 1-5

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/8/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION

4/9/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STAT...)

4/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STAT...)

Notice of Continuance - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE

4/12/2021: Notice of Continuance - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • Hearing08/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • Hearing08/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • Hearing08/02/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion - Other Augment Expert Designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • Hearing07/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Second Continuance of Motions in Limine); Filed by Ralphs Grocery Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketMotion to Augment (TO AUGMENT PLAINTIFF?S EXPERT DESIGNATION;); Filed by Galina Shepel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (augment) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion - Other augment) of 06/22/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other augment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketDEFENDANT RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY DBA RALPHS'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ralphs Grocery Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Galina Shepel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Galina Shepel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Galina Shepel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC670094    Hearing Date: October 24, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

galina shepel,

Plaintiff,

v.

ralphs grocery company, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC670094

Hearing Date: October 24, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motions to compel discovery responses

Defendant Ralphs Grocery Company (“Defendant”) move to compel responses from Plaintiff Galina Shepel (“Plaintiff”) to: (1) Supplemental Request for Production of Documents (“RPD”); and (2) Form Interrogatories, Set Two (“FROG”).

Defendant served the discovery at issue on Plaintiff by mail on March 25, 2019. Defendant granted Plaintiff multiple extensions of time to respond, up to May 31, 2019. On that date, Plaintiff served unverified responses. “Unsworn responses are tantamount to no responses at all.”  (Appleton v. Superior Court (1988) 206 Cal.App.3d 632, 636.)  Accordingly, the motions to compel responses to the RPD and FROG are granted per Code of Civil Procedure sections 2030.290 and 2031.300. Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses, without objections, to Defendants’ RPD and FROG within 30 days of service of this order.

Defendant seeks sanctions in connection with the motions. The Court concludes that Plaintiff’s failure to serve verified responses to the discovery is an abuse of the discovery process. The court awards sanctions against Plaintiff in the amount of $720, which represents four hours of attorney time to prepare the motions and attend the hearing at $180 per hour, plus two filing fees of $60 each

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Defendant’s motions to compel responses to the RPD and FROG are granted per Code of Civil Procedure sections 2030.290 and 2031.300. Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses, without objections, within 30 days of notice of this order.

Plaintiff is ordered to pay monetary sanctions in the amount of $840 to Defendant, by and through counsel, within 30 days of notice of this order.

Defendant is ordered to provide notice of this order and file proof of service of such.

DATED: October 24, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAKHCHAKOVA DIANA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ESLAMBOLY-HAKIM SHARONA ESLAMBOLY ESQ.