Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2021 at 16:11:20 (UTC).

GALEANO, MARIA ESTHER VS GALEANO, OSCAR DANILO

Case Summary

On 05/20/2020 GALEANO, MARIA ESTHER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GALEANO, OSCAR DANILO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0693

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GALEANO MARIA ESTHER

Respondent

GALEANO OSCAR DANILO

 

Court Documents

Request - Enter Default FL165 - MAILED TO RESPONDENT 7-30-20

7/29/2020: Request - Enter Default FL165 - MAILED TO RESPONDENT 7-30-20

Declaration - Default FL170

7/29/2020: Declaration - Default FL170

Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

7/29/2020: Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure

Proof of Service of Summons

7/29/2020: Proof of Service of Summons

Judgment

8/19/2020: Judgment

Notice - Entry of Judgment

8/27/2020: Notice - Entry of Judgment

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

5/20/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

5/20/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

5/20/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Summons

5/20/2020: Summons

Notice - Case Assignment

5/20/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

5/20/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165 (MAILED TO RESPONDENT 7-30-20 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less