This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/25/2020 at 04:24:25 (UTC).

GAINES, TIMMORA LYNN VS HUKWU, STANLEY

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 GAINES, TIMMORA LYNN filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against HUKWU, STANLEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TITUS, PATRICIA J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0935

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TITUS, PATRICIA J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GAINES TIMMORA LYNN

Respondent

HUKWU STANLEY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

10/22/2020: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Temporary Restrianging Order and Notice of Hearing

10/15/2020: Proof of Service - Temporary Restrianging Order and Notice of Hearing

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

9/25/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

9/25/2020: Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - GRANTED

9/25/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - GRANTED

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

9/25/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 6, Titus, Patricia J, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (Temporary Restrianging Order and Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (GRANTED ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less