This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2019 at 01:39:46 (UTC).

GAIANE AKOPIAN VS INTERNATIONAL COFFEE & TEA LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/11/2018 GAIANE AKOPIAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INTERNATIONAL COFFEE TEA LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1578

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AKOPIAN GAIANE

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

WESTFIELD LLC

INTERNATIONAL COFFEE & TEA LLC

DOES 1 TO 20

SHERMAN OAKS FASHION ASSOCIATES LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

INTERNATIONAL COFFEE & TEA LLC

SHERMAN OAKS FASHION ASSOCIATES LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Not Yet Classified

CROSS-COMPLAINANT SHERMAN OAKS FASHION ASSOCIATES LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MNATSAKANYAN GOR

Defendant Attorney

HOTCHKISS KELSEY LYNNE

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

OLIVIA MAJIA

EYERLY DAWN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

CHECK ALERT

4/24/2018: CHECK ALERT

CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING FEES REQUIRED

4/24/2018: CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING FEES REQUIRED

DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL COFFEE AND TEA LLCS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

6/1/2018: DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL COFFEE AND TEA LLCS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

INTERNATIONAL COFFEE & TEA LLC'S CROSS COMPLAINT

6/1/2018: INTERNATIONAL COFFEE & TEA LLC'S CROSS COMPLAINT

SHERMAN OAKS FASHION ASSOCIATES, L.P.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

6/15/2018: SHERMAN OAKS FASHION ASSOCIATES, L.P.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT FOR:EXPRESS INDEMNITY;AND ETC.

7/23/2018: CROSS COMPLAINT FOR:EXPRESS INDEMNITY;AND ETC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/10/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

CROSS-DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL COFFEE & TEA, LLC'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT SHERMAN OAKS FASHION ASSOCIATES, LLC'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/22/2018: CROSS-DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL COFFEE & TEA, LLC'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT SHERMAN OAKS FASHION ASSOCIATES, LLC'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order

2/15/2019: Stipulation and Order

Notice of Deposit - Jury

3/1/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Notice of Deposit - Jury

3/8/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Motion for Summary Judgment

6/25/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Brief

6/25/2019: Brief

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/27/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REDEMPTION/ REMITTANCE NOTICE

4/30/2018: REDEMPTION/ REMITTANCE NOTICE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/25/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

4/17/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1) NEGLIGENCE 2) PREMISES LIABILITY

4/11/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1) NEGLIGENCE 2) PREMISES LIABILITY

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • Separate Statement; Filed by Sherman Oaks Fashion Associates, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Separate Statement; Filed by Sherman Oaks Fashion Associates, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by Sherman Oaks Fashion Associates, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Brief (DEFENDANT AND CROSS-DEFENDANT SHERMAN OAKS FASHION ASSOCIATES, L.P.'S JOINT COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION(S) FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AGAINST GAIANE AKOPIAN AND INTERNATIONAL COFFEE & TEA, LLC); Filed by Sherman Oaks Fashion Associates, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by Sherman Oaks Fashion Associates, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by International Coffee & Tea LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Gaiane Akopian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Sherman Oaks Fashion Associates, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Request (REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL); Filed by Sherman Oaks Fashion Associates, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Stipulation and Order ([Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order); Filed by International Coffee & Tea LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Gaiane Akopian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING FEES REQUIRED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • CHECK ALERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Gaiane Akopian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Gaiane Akopian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1) NEGLIGENCE 2) PREMISES LIABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC701578    Hearing Date: October 29, 2019    Dept: 2

AFTER REVIEW OF THE COURT FILE, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDER:

Department 2 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above-entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in the Northwest District, Van Nuys, JUDGE H. COTTON presiding in Department A for further assignment. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.