This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/15/2019 at 05:08:11 (UTC).

GADI MAIER ET AL VS ALAN C FOX ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/03/2017 GADI MAIER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALAN C FOX. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT, RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, SAMANTHA JESSNER and TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0829

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

SAMANTHA JESSNER

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MAIER MARLENE

MAIER GADI

Defendants and Respondents

FOX ALAN C.

ACF PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC

DOES 1 TO 100

Other

CLARK & TREVITHICK LAW OFFICES OF

Not Classified By Court

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LEONARD RICHARD C. ESQ.

LEONARD RICHARD C.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

TURKEN JAMES H. ESQ.

TURKEN JAMES HENRY

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANTS ALAN C. FOX AND ACF MANAGEMENT INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRERS AND DEMURRERS TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GEORGIANA NIKIAS

3/20/2018: DEFENDANTS ALAN C. FOX AND ACF MANAGEMENT INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRERS AND DEMURRERS TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF GEORGIANA NIKIAS

REPLY AND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ISSUE AND MONETARY SANCTIONS FOR VIOLATION OF COURT ORDERS DATED NOVEMBER 16, 2017, MARCH 21, 2018 AND APRIL 20, 2018

8/15/2018: REPLY AND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ISSUE AND MONETARY SANCTIONS FOR VIOLATION OF COURT ORDERS DATED NOVEMBER 16, 2017, MARCH 21, 2018 AND APRIL 20, 2018

DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR MONETARY AND ISSUE SANCTIONS FOR VIOLATION OF COURT ORDER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF JAMES TURKEN IN SUPP

7/9/2018: DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR MONETARY AND ISSUE SANCTIONS FOR VIOLATION OF COURT ORDER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF JAMES TURKEN IN SUPP

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR MONETARY AND ISSUE SANCTIONS FOR VIOLATION OF COURT ORDER

7/10/2018: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR MONETARY AND ISSUE SANCTIONS FOR VIOLATION OF COURT ORDER

Minute Order

2/23/2018: Minute Order

EX PARTE APPLICATION ADVANCING HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH TO A DATE BEFORE THE TRIAL; DECLARATION OF STEVEN A. SCHUMAN IN SUPPORT THEREOF

3/19/2018: EX PARTE APPLICATION ADVANCING HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH TO A DATE BEFORE THE TRIAL; DECLARATION OF STEVEN A. SCHUMAN IN SUPPORT THEREOF

DEFENDANT ACF PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS FOR VIOLATION OF COURT ORDER; ETC.

3/26/2018: DEFENDANT ACF PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS FOR VIOLATION OF COURT ORDER; ETC.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF STEVEN A. SCHUMAN IN SUPPORT THEREOF

3/29/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF STEVEN A. SCHUMAN IN SUPPORT THEREOF

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF STEVEN A. SCHUMAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER

4/2/2018: SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF STEVEN A. SCHUMAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR MONETARY AND ISSUE SANCTIONS FOR VIOLATION OF COURT ORDER; ETC.

4/12/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR MONETARY AND ISSUE SANCTIONS FOR VIOLATION OF COURT ORDER; ETC.

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

4/20/2018: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

5/10/2018: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JAMES H. TURKEN IN SUPPORT THEREOF

5/11/2018: DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JAMES H. TURKEN IN SUPPORT THEREOF

DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES, AND THE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT; ETC.

5/11/2018: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES, AND THE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT; ETC.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE AND SUBPOENA TO CITY NATIONAL BANK AND/OR TO MODIFY; DECLARATION OF GEORGIANA A. NIKIAS AND REBECCA LAWLOR CALKINS

11/22/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE AND SUBPOENA TO CITY NATIONAL BANK AND/OR TO MODIFY; DECLARATION OF GEORGIANA A. NIKIAS AND REBECCA LAWLOR CALKINS

Unknown

11/3/2017: Unknown

DEFENDANTS ALAN C. FOX AN]) ACF MANAGEMENT INC.?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER KADISH

9/11/2017: DEFENDANTS ALAN C. FOX AN]) ACF MANAGEMENT INC.?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER KADISH

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

8/9/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

184 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • at 2:20 PM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 03/06/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 74; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 74; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 1, Samantha Jessner, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re: 170.6 CCP Reassignment with Related Cases) of 01/10/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Minute Order ((Court Order Re: 170.6 CCP Reassignment with Related Cases)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
400 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Gadi Maier (Plaintiff); Marlene Maier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC670829    Hearing Date: February 04, 2020    Dept: 50

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 50

gadi maier, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

vs.

alan c. fox, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.:

BC 670829

Hearing Date:

February 4, 2020

Hearing Time:

8:30 a.m.

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE:

DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO WITHDRAW BOND ON APPEAL

Defendants Alan C. Fox (“Fox”), individually and as Trustee of the Alan C. Fox Revocable Trust, and ACF Property Management, Inc. (collectively, “Defendants”) move for an order allowing Defendants to withdraw the cash bond posted for appeal. The motion is unopposed.

The Court issued a sanctions order for $11,000 on August 3, 2018. Fox appealed the order and posted a cash bond in the amount of $20,775 on August 9, 2018. (Thakor Decl., ¶ 2.) Since then, this matter has been settled, and pursuant to the parties’ settlement, Plaintiffs have dismissed this case, and Fox has dismissed his appeal. (Thakor Decl., ¶ 3.) Because Fox is no longer appealing the sanctions order, Fox seeks to withdraw the cash bond posted for appeal.

Based on the foregoing the lack of an opposition, the Court grants Defendants’ motion to withdraw the cash bond. Defendants are ordered to give notice of this ruling.

DATED: February 4, 2020 ________________________________

Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet

Judge, Los Angeles Superior Court