This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/14/2021 at 09:30:52 (UTC).

GABRIELA RAMIREZ VS CITY OF BELLFLOWER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/01/2020 GABRIELA RAMIREZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF BELLFLOWER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5919

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMIREZ GABRIELA

Defendants

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

CITY OF BELLFLOWER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BARBER JOHN

Other Attorneys

AZIZI DAVID

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/1/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/1/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/1/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/1/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

1/6/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

1/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Answer

1/26/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2023
  • Hearing11/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • Hearing05/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • Hearing05/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CITY OF BELLFLOWER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by GABRIELA RAMIREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by GABRIELA RAMIREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by GABRIELA RAMIREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF BELLFLOWER is a litigant