This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/04/2022 at 16:09:52 (UTC).

GABRIELA RAEY VS THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 GABRIELA RAEY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6648

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAEY GABRIELA

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED

Cross Defendant

ROES 1-50 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILBERT DANIEL M

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

CLANCEY CLIFFORD ALLEN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/22/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

1/25/2022: Answer

Cross-Complaint

1/25/2022: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/25/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/25/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

1/4/2022: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

1/4/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Request for Dismissal

6/8/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Gabriela Raey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gabriela Raey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gabriela Raey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gabriela Raey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED is a litigant