This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/01/2022 at 05:27:58 (UTC).

GABRIELA NARVAEZ HERNANDEZ VS REZOLUT IMAGING MANAGEMENT OF CA, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/10/2022 GABRIELA NARVAEZ HERNANDEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against REZOLUT IMAGING MANAGEMENT OF CA, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5773

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NARVAEZ HERNANDEZ GABRIELA

Defendant

REZOLUT IMAGING MANAGEMENT OF CA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TSARUKYAN ANDRANIK

Defendant Attorney

OLAH FRANK C.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

8/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/11/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/10/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

8/10/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

8/10/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/10/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT REZOLUT IMAGING MANAGEMENT OF CA, LLCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF GABRIELA NARVAEZ HERNANDEZ COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

9/13/2022: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT REZOLUT IMAGING MANAGEMENT OF CA, LLCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF GABRIELA NARVAEZ HERNANDEZ COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2023
  • Hearing01/04/2023 at 2:00 PM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketAnswer DEFENDANT REZOLUT IMAGING MANAGEMENT OF CA, LLCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF GABRIELA NARVAEZ HERNANDEZ COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; Filed by: Rezolut Imaging Management of CA, LLC (Defendant); As to: Gabriela Narvaez Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Gabriela Narvaez Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Rezolut Imaging Management of CA, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 08/11/2022; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/04/2023 at 02:00 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Gabriela Narvaez Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Rezolut Imaging Management of CA, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Gabriela Narvaez Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Rezolut Imaging Management of CA, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Gabriela Narvaez Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Rezolut Imaging Management of CA, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet in Department 50 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OLAH FRANK C.