This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 14:49:38 (UTC).

GABRIELA LARA ET AL VS JENNY YOON ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/19/2017 GABRIELA LARA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JENNY YOON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BENNY C. OSORIO and STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1970

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BENNY C. OSORIO

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

LARA GABRIELA

LOPEZ ISABEL

LOPEZ JOSE

Defendants and Respondents

YOON JENNY

DOES 1 TO 10

LEE MOON SOO

LEE JENNY

Minor

JIMENEZ ANTHONY

Guardian Ad Litem

JIMENEZ A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorneys

OLIVO EDUARDO ESQ.

LERMAN STEVEN A. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SCHENKMAN MARK A. ESQ.

MACDONALD SCOTT L

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RULING OF CONSOLIDATED CASES

4/10/2018: NOTICE OF RULING OF CONSOLIDATED CASES

Unknown

9/26/2018: Unknown

Unknown

9/26/2018: Unknown

Unknown

9/26/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

9/26/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/27/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

4/2/2019: Notice of Ruling

Association of Attorney

4/25/2019: Association of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

6/4/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order

1/23/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/27/2017: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Unknown

12/7/2017: Unknown

PLAINTIFFS GABRIELA LARA'S AND ANTHONY JIMENEZ'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEE DEPOSIT

10/30/2017: PLAINTIFFS GABRIELA LARA'S AND ANTHONY JIMENEZ'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEE DEPOSIT

Unknown

10/30/2017: Unknown

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (NEGLIGENCE)

5/19/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (NEGLIGENCE)

SUMMONS

5/19/2017: SUMMONS

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

5/19/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/23/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Jenny Yoon (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Jenny Yoon (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Jenny Yoon (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for An Order Continuing the April 18, 2019 trial date); Filed by Jenny Yoon (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Jenny Yoon (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Jenny Yoon (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jenny Yoon (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Gabriela Lara (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (NEGLIGENCE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gabriela Lara (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****1970    Hearing Date: July 01, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

GABRIELA LARA, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

jenny yoon,

Defendant.

Case No.: ****1970

order RE: petition to approve compromise of pending action

The Court has reviewed the petition by Petitioner Jose A. Jimenez (“Petitioner”) on behalf of Claimant Anthony Jimenez (“Claimant”). The Court finds that the settlement of $50,000 is fair and reasonable, especially because Defendant tendered the policy limit of $500,000 for a global settlement with all plaintiffs. The Court finds that the deductions for medical expenses, costs, and attorneys’ fees are fair and reasonable.

Petitioner initially proposed that the balance of the proceeds—$26,572.87—be used as follows: (1) $5,000 would be deposited into an unrestricted account, and (2) $21,572.87 would be placed in a tax-free structured settlement annuity policy from Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company. Petitioner further proposed to use the funds deposited in the unrestricted account to pay rent. Petitioner represented that he has “lost his job because of the Corona virus restrictions on his employer” and “has no source of income.” Petitioner also represented that “[h]is wife is also unemployed.” The Court granted leave to file a supplemental declaration addressing some of the Court’s concerns. However, Petitioner has notified the Court that he is abandoning his request to use any of the settlement to pay rent and instead proposes that the $5,000 be deposited into a blocked account to be used for the benefit of Claimant. With this change, the Court approves the settlement. The Court orders Petitioner to prepare and lodge a proposed order to deposit funds into a blocked account (Form MC-355) within ten days. The Court sets an Order to Show Cause re: Funding of Annuity, Deposit of Funds into Blocked Account, and Dismissal for September 10, 2020, at 8:30 a.m. Petitioner shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: June 30, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



Case Number: ****1970    Hearing Date: June 30, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

GABRIELA LARA, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

jenny yoon,

Defendant.

Case No.: ****1970

order RE: petition to approve compromise of pending action

The Court has reviewed the petition by Petitioner Jose A. Jimenez (“Petitioner”) on behalf of Claimant Anthony Jimenez (“Claimant”). The Court finds that the settlement of $50,000 is fair and reasonable, especially because Defendant tendered the policy limit of $500,000 for a global settlement with all plaintiffs. The Court finds that the deductions for medical expenses, costs, and attorneys’ fees are fair and reasonable.

Petitioner initially proposed that the balance of the proceeds—$26,572.87—be used as follows: (1) $5,000 would be deposited into an unrestricted account, and (2) $21,572.87 would be placed in a tax-free structured settlement annuity policy from Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company. Petitioner further proposed to use the funds deposited in the unrestricted account to pay rent. Petitioner represented that he has “lost his job because of the Corona virus restrictions on his employer” and “has no source of income.” Petitioner also represented that “[h]is wife is also unemployed.” The Court granted leave to file a supplemental declaration addressing some of the Court’s concerns. However, Petitioner has notified the Court that he is abandoning his request to use any of the settlement to pay rent and instead proposes that the $5,000 be deposited into a blocked account to be used for the benefit of Claimant. With this change, the Court approves the settlement. The Court orders Petitioner to prepare and lodge a proposed order to deposit funds into a blocked account (Form MC-355) within ten days. The Court sets an Order to Show Cause re: Funding of Annuity, Deposit of Funds into Blocked Account, and Dismissal for September 10, 2020, at 8:30 a.m. Petitioner shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: June 30, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



Case Number: ****1970    Hearing Date: November 05, 2019    Dept: 5

Gabriela Lara, et al. v. Jenny Yoon, et al.

Case No. ****1970

Tentative Order on Motion for a Mandatory Settlement Conference with Judge James R. Dunn

The motion for a mandatory settlement conference with Judge James R. Dunn is denied, as a noticed motion is not appropriate for this type of request. Instead, the Court orders the parties to participate in a mandatory settlement conference with the volunteer settlement attorneys from the American Board of Trial Advocates, the Association of Southern California Defense Counsel, and the Consumer Attorneys Association of Los Angeles. The parties shall comply with the Court’s Third Amended Standing Order Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference, Effective August 7, 2018. The Court’s clerk shall provide notice.